Tennessee 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Tennessee House Bill HB1318 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/26/2025

                    SB 1304 - HB 1318 
FISCAL NOTE 
 
 
 
Fiscal Review Committee 
Tennessee General Assembly 
 
February 26, 2025 
Fiscal Analyst: Chris Higgins | Email: chris.higgins@capitol.tn.gov | Phone: 615-741-2564 
 
SB 1304 - HB 1318 
 
SUMMARY OF BILL:    Extends, from June 30, 2025 to June 30, 2030, the Access Tennessee 
Act of 2006. 
 
 
FISCAL IMPACT: 
 
NOT SIGNIFICANT 
 
 Assumptions: 
 
• The proposed legislation continues the Access Tennessee program at its current funding 
level.  
• Pursuant to Tenn. Code Ann. § 56-7-2910(h), no person is eligible for the program who 
was not already enrolled prior to April 22, 2015.  
• Access Tennessee is funded by Access Tennessee Reserves in the amount of $700,000 for 
FY24-25. 
 
 
IMPACT TO COMMERCE: 
 
NOT SIGNIFICANT 
 
 Assumption: 
 
• The proposed legislation continues an existing program and will not have a significant 
impact on commerce or jobs in Tennessee.  
 
 
CERTIFICATION: 
 
 The information contained herein is true and correct to the best of my knowledge. 
   
Bojan Savic, Executive Director