Tennessee 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Tennessee Senate Bill SB0654 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/01/2025

                    SB 654 - HB 717 
FISCAL NOTE 
 
 
 
Fiscal Review Committee 
Tennessee General Assembly 
 
February 28, 2025 
Fiscal Analyst: Chris Higgins | Email: chris.higgins@capitol.tn.gov | Phone: 615-741-2564 
 
SB 654 - HB 717 
 
SUMMARY OF BILL:    Enacts the Caring for Caregivers Act. Requires the Department of 
Disability and Aging (DDA) to establish and administer a pilot program to provide grants to family 
caregivers of eligible family members with Alzheimer's disease or related dementia. Requires the 
pilot program to be operated from July 1, 2025 to December 31, 2028. 
 
Creates the Family Caregiver Grant Fund (Fund), composed of funds appropriated by the General 
Assembly and gifts, grants, and other donations received by DDA. Requires grants to be awarded to 
applicants on a first-come, first-served basis limited to the amount of $6,000 per family caregiver per 
fiscal year. Establishes that, to be eligible for a grant, a family caregiver's annual adjusted income 
from all sources must not exceed $37,000. Specifies that the legislative intent is an initial 
appropriation of $600,000 in FY25-26. 
 
Requires DDA to submit a report on or before October 1, 2026, and by October 1 of each 
subsequent year, to the chair of the Health and Welfare Committee of the Senate and the chair of 
the committee in the House of Representatives having jurisdiction over health-related matters on the 
status of the program and on the funds received and payments made by the Fund. 
 
 
FISCAL IMPACT: 
 
STATE GOVERNMENT 
REVENUE 	Family Caregiver Grant Fund 
Each FY25-26 through FY28-29 	$600,000 
   
EXPENDITURES 	General Fund Family Caregiver Grant Fund 
Each FY25-26 through FY28-29 	$600,000 	$600,000 
      
 Assumptions: 
 
• According to the Alzheimer's Association's 2024 Alzheimer's Disease Facts and Figures special 
report, there were approximately 129,200 individuals age 65 or over with Alzheimer's 
disease in Tennessee, as of 2020. 
• In 2023, approximately 369,000 caregivers provided support for those with Alzheimer's or 
other dementias in Tennessee, resulting in an estimated value of $7,804,000,000 in unpaid 
care. 
• The proposed legislation establishes the intent that an initial appropriation of $600,000 be 
made in FY25-26 for awarding grants from the Fund.   
 	SB 654 - HB 717  	2 
• It is assumed that 100 eligible caregivers will receive a $6,000 grant each year, resulting in an 
increase in expenditures of $600,000 (100 x $6,000) from the Fund in FY25-26 through 
FY28-29.  
• The DDA can award grants and submit the required reports utilizing existing personnel and 
resources, without a significant increase in expenditures. 
 
 
CERTIFICATION: 
 
 The information contained herein is true and correct to the best of my knowledge. 
   
Bojan Savic, Executive Director