Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB103 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Brown of Brazos (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 103
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2009;
 May 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 21, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 103 By: Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of certain health benefit plans through
 student health centers of certain institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Section 51.953, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.953. [CERTAIN REVENUE RECEIVED FROM] STUDENT HEALTH
 CENTER [SERVICES].
 SECTION 2. Section 51.953, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), (f), (g), and (h) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  A student health center of an institution of higher
 education with a total student enrollment of more than 20,000
 students in one or more semesters of the preceding academic year
 shall assist a student or other person entitled to obtain health
 care services through the health center in receiving benefits under
 a health benefit plan in which the student or other person is an
 enrollee by filing or having a claim filed with the issuer of the
 health benefit plan on behalf of the student or other person.  The
 institution may contract with a third-party billing service to
 provide the assistance required by this subsection.
 (d)  An institution of higher education, on behalf of the
 institution's student health center, may contract with a health
 benefit plan issuer that engages in the business of insurance in the
 health service region established by the Department of State Health
 Services in which the institution is located to provide a health
 benefit plan under which health care services are provided to
 students or other persons entitled to obtain health care services
 through the student health center who are covered by the plan.
 (e)  An institution of higher education must enter into
 contracts with at least three of the largest health benefit plan
 issuers that engage in the business of insurance in the health
 service region established by the Department of State Health
 Services in which the institution is located under which the
 institution's student health center:
 (1)  serves as a preferred provider under the preferred
 provider benefit plans operated by the issuers; or
 (2)  operates as a provider of in-network coverage
 under the health maintenance organizations operated by the issuers.
 (f)  An institution of higher education may authorize the
 institution's student health center to accept a student's medical
 services fee, as charged by the institution under Chapter 54, as
 payment toward:
 (1) a copayment;
 (2) a deductible; or
 (3)  a charge for a service not covered by the student's
 health benefit plan.
 (g)  Money received by the student health center as a result
 of a claim filed by or on behalf of a student through a health
 benefit plan shall be retained for use by the student health center.
 (h)  Not later than January 15 of each year, the governing
 board of an institution of higher education shall report to the
 legislature the amount of the following sources of income for
 funding the institution's student health center:
 (1) money received from student fees and charges;
 (2)  money received from the operation of the student
 health center's pharmacy;
 (3)  money received as a result of a claim filed by or
 on behalf of the institution's student health center under a health
 benefit plan sponsored by or administered on behalf of the
 institution; and
 (4)  money received as a result of a claim filed by or
 on behalf of the institution's student health center under a health
 benefit plan other than a plan sponsored by or administered on
 behalf of the institution.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *