Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1079 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kolkhorst (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 1079
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Economic Development; April 30, 2009, rereferred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 7, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 7, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appellate process for the community development
 block grant program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 487.351, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  An applicant for a grant, loan, or award under a
 community development block grant program may appeal a decision of
 the executive director by filing an appeal with the board. The
 board shall hold a hearing on the appeal and render a decision.
 SECTION 2. (a) The state community development review
 committee is abolished.
 (b) Section 487.353, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *