Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1084 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Truitt (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 1084
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to shipment of wine to ultimate consumers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 16.09(e), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e) The holder of a winery permit may not:
 (1) sell or ship wine to a minor;
 (2) deliver wine to a consumer using a carrier that
 does not hold a carrier's permit under this code; or
 (3) deliver to the same consumer in this state more
 than nine [three] gallons of wine within any 30-day period or more
 than 36 gallons of wine within any 12-month period [to the same
 consumer in this state].
 SECTION 2. Section 54.02, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.02. PROHIBITED ACTIVITIES. The holder of an
 out-of-state winery direct shipper's permit may not:
 (1) sell or ship wine to a minor;
 (2) deliver wine to a consumer using a carrier that
 does not hold a carrier's permit under this code;
 (3) deliver to the same consumer in this state more
 than nine [three] gallons of wine within any 30-day period or more
 than 36 gallons of wine within any 12-month period [to the same
 consumer in this state]; or
 (4) sell to ultimate consumers more than 35,000
 gallons of wine annually.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *