Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1117 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hochberg (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 1117
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1117 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to ballot instructions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 52, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 52.0695 to read as follows:
 Sec. 52.0695.  GENERAL BALLOT INSTRUCTION. (a) In addition
 to any other required ballot instructions, a ballot must contain an
 instruction that clearly and unambiguously describes how to cast a
 ballot using the voting equipment on which the voter's ballot will
 be cast and includes an explanation of actions by the voter that may
 change or otherwise affect a prior selection by the voter. An
 instruction required by this subsection must describe the effect of
 not properly marking a paper ballot, if a paper ballot is used.
 (b)  The secretary of state shall determine when the
 instruction described by Subsection (a) is necessary and by rule
 shall prescribe the specific instruction to be included on a ballot
 under this section.
 (c)  Failure to comply with this section is not grounds for a
 civil action or an action or contest challenging the validity or
 result of an election in which the ballot instruction required by
 this section was not given to one or more voters.
 SECTION 2. Section 52.071, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c) An instruction under this section shall also describe:
 (1)  the effect of a straight-party vote if the vote
 would not apply to all elections on the ballot; and
 (2)  any circumstances under which casting a vote for
 an individual candidate will negate a straight-party vote or
 otherwise cause a vote for a nominee of the same party to not be
 recorded or counted.
 (d)  The secretary of state shall by rule prescribe the
 specific instructions to be included under Subsection (c).  Failure
 to comply with Subsection (c) is not grounds for a civil action or
 an action or contest challenging the validity or result of an
 election in which the ballot instruction described by Subsection
 (c) was not given to one or more voters.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 124, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 124.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 124.007.  WARNING FOR CERTAIN VOTING ACTIONS. (a)
 Where practicable, electronic voting systems shall provide for a
 clearly worded warning to appear if a voter attempts to cast a vote,
 make a selection, or take another related action that could cancel a
 prior selection, change a prior selection, or cancel or change a
 straight-party selection made by the voter.
 (b)  The secretary of state shall determine when the warning
 described by Subsection (a) is necessary and shall by rule
 prescribe warning language for each voting system approved for use
 in the state.
 (c)  Failure to comply with this section is not grounds for a
 civil action or an action or contest challenging the validity or
 result of an election in which the warning required by this section
 was not given to one or more voters.
 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an election held on or after January 1, 2010. An election held
 before January 1, 2010, is governed by the law in effect when the
 election is held, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *