Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1128 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R5719 YDB-F
 By: McReynolds H.B. No. 1128


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain corrective actions by the Texas Board of
 Nursing including a pilot program on deferred disciplinary action;
 providing corrective actions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter N to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER N. CORRECTIVE ACTION PROCEEDING
 Sec. 301.651.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "corrective
 action" means a fine or remedial education imposed under Section
 301.652.
 Sec. 301.652.  IMPOSITION OF CORRECTIVE ACTION. (a) The
 board may impose a corrective action on a person licensed or
 regulated under this chapter who violates this chapter or a rule or
 order adopted under this chapter. The corrective action:
 (1)  may be a fine, remedial education, or any
 combination of a fine or remedial education;
 (2)  is not a disciplinary action under Subchapter J;
 and
 (3)  is subject to disclosure only to the extent a
 complaint is subject to disclosure under Section 301.466.
 Sec. 301.653.  REPORT AND NOTICE OF VIOLATION AND CORRECTIVE
 ACTION. (a) If the executive director determines that a violation
 has occurred, the executive director may issue a report to the board
 stating:
 (1) the facts on which the determination is based; and
 (2) a recommended corrective action.
 (b)  If three or more members of the board disagree with the
 executive director's determination and recommendation for
 corrective action, the board may:
 (1) modify the determination or corrective action; or
 (2) dismiss the case.
 (c)  The executive director shall give written notice of the
 determination and recommendation for corrective action to the
 person subject to the corrective action not later than the 14th day
 after the date the determination is issued. The notice must be
 given by certified mail. The notice must:
 (1) include a brief summary of the alleged violation;
 (2) state the recommended corrective action; and
 (3)  inform the person of the person's options in
 responding to the notice.
 Sec. 301.654.  RESPONSE. Not later than the 20th day after
 the date the person receives the notice under Section 301.653(c),
 the person may:
 (1)  accept in writing the executive director's
 determination and recommended corrective action; or
 (2)  reject the executive director's determination and
 recommended corrective action.
 Sec. 301.655.  ACTION FOLLOWING RESPONSE. (a) If the person
 accepts the executive director's determination and satisfies the
 recommended corrective action, the case is closed.
 (b)  If the person does not accept the executive director's
 determination and recommended corrective action as originally
 proposed or as modified by the board or fails to respond in a timely
 manner to the executive director's notice as provided by Section
 301.654, the executive director shall:
 (1) terminate proceedings under this subchapter; and
 (2)  dispose of the matter as a complaint under
 Subchapter J.
 Sec. 301.656.  EFFECT OF ACCEPTANCE OF CORRECTIVE ACTION. A
 person's acceptance of a corrective action under this subchapter
 does not constitute an admission of a violation, but does
 constitute a plea of nolo contendere.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.1607 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.1607.  PILOT PROGRAM ON DEFERRAL OF FINAL
 DISCIPLINARY ACTION. (a) In this section, "deferred disciplinary
 action" means a final disciplinary action against a person licensed
 or regulated under this chapter that is deferred by the board as
 provided by this section.
 (b)  Not later than February 1, 2010, the board shall
 determine the feasibility of conducting a pilot program designed to
 evaluate the efficacy and effect on the public's protection of
 board deferral of disciplinary action against a person licensed or
 regulated under this chapter in cases in which the board proposes to
 impose a sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or
 revocation of a license. If the board determines the pilot program
 is feasible, the board shall develop and implement the pilot
 program not later than February 1, 2011. The pilot program must
 conclude not later than January 1, 2014.
 (c)  The pilot program may not include cases in which the
 board proposes to issue a reprimand or to deny, suspend, or revoke a
 license.
 (d)  During the time the pilot program is implemented and for
 any action or complaint for which the board proposes to impose a
 sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or
 revocation of a license, the board may:
 (1)  defer final disciplinary action the board has
 proposed against a person licensed or regulated under this chapter
 if the person conforms to conditions imposed by the board,
 including any condition the board could impose as a condition of
 probation under Section 301.468; and
 (2)  if the person successfully meets the imposed
 conditions, dismiss the complaint.
 (e)  Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a
 deferred disciplinary action by the board under the pilot program
 is not confidential and is subject to disclosure in accordance with
 Chapter 552, Government Code. If the person successfully meets the
 conditions imposed by the board in deferring final disciplinary
 action and the board dismisses the action or complaint, the
 deferred disciplinary action of the board is confidential to the
 same extent as a complaint filed under Section 301.466.
 (f)  The board may contract with a third party to evaluate
 the pilot program established under this section.
 (g)  The board shall appoint an advisory committee to assist
 the board in overseeing the pilot program and its evaluation. The
 committee must include representatives of public advocacy
 organizations.
 (h) This section expires September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Chapter
 301, Occupations Code, apply to actions for violations under
 Chapter 301 pending on the effective date of this Act or commenced
 on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.