Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1145 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R6175 JRH-D
 By: Brown of Kaufman H.B. No. 1145


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of election judges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 32.002(a), (b), and (c), Election Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a) The commissioners court at its August [July] term shall
 appoint the election judges for each regular county election
 precinct.
 (b) Judges appointed under Subsection (a) serve for a term
 of one year beginning on September 1 [August 1] following the
 appointment, except that the commissioners court by order recorded
 in its minutes may provide for a term of two years.
 (c) The presiding judge and alternate presiding judge must
 be affiliated or aligned with different political parties, subject
 to this subsection. Before August [July] of each year, the county
 chair of a political party whose candidate for governor received
 the highest or second highest number of votes in the county in the
 most recent gubernatorial general election shall submit in writing
 to the commissioners court a list of names of persons in order of
 preference for each precinct who are eligible for appointment as an
 election judge. The county chair may supplement the list of names
 of persons until the 20th day before a general election or the 15th
 day before a special election in case an appointed election judge
 becomes unable to serve. The commissioners court shall appoint the
 first person meeting the applicable eligibility requirements from
 the list submitted in compliance with this subsection by the party
 with the highest number of votes in the precinct as the presiding
 judge and the first person meeting the applicable eligibility
 requirements from the list submitted in compliance with this
 subsection by the party with the second highest number of votes in
 the precinct as the alternate presiding judge. The commissioners
 court may reject the list if the persons whose names are submitted
 on the list are determined not to meet the applicable eligibility
 requirements.
 SECTION 2. The term of an election judge serving on the
 effective date of this Act expires:
 (1) September 1, 2010, if the judge's term would expire
 August 1, 2010, under Section 32.002(b), Election Code, as that
 section existed before amendment by this Act; or
 (2) September 1, 2011, if the judge's term would expire
 August 1, 2011, under Section 32.002(b), Election Code, as that
 section existed before amendment by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.