Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1174 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hartnett (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1174
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2009, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1174 By: Gallegos


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to payment by a municipality or river authority for
 certain damages caused by the municipality's or river authority's
 operation of a sanitary sewer system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 552, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 552.912 to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.912.  CERTAIN DAMAGES CAUSED BY SEWAGE BACKUP. (a)
 A municipality or a river authority may pay actual property damages
 caused by the backup of the municipality's or river authority's
 sanitary sewer system regardless of whether the municipality or
 river authority would be liable for the damages under Chapter 101,
 Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 (b)  This section does not waive governmental immunity from
 suit or liability.
 SECTION 2. Section 552.912, Local Government Code, as added
 by this Act, applies to damages caused by the backup of a sanitary
 sewer system on or after March 1, 2007.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *