Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1174 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1174


 AN ACT
 relating to payment by a municipality or river authority for
 certain damages caused by the municipality's or river authority's
 operation of a sanitary sewer system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 552, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 552.912 to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.912.  CERTAIN DAMAGES CAUSED BY SEWAGE BACKUP. (a)
 A municipality or a river authority, other than a river authority
 listed in Subsection (c), may pay actual property damages caused by
 the backup of the municipality's or river authority's sanitary
 sewer system regardless of whether the municipality or river
 authority would be liable for the damages under Chapter 101, Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code.
 (b)  This section does not waive governmental immunity from
 suit or liability.
 (c)  This section does not apply to the Trinity River
 Authority, the San Jacinto River Authority, the Sabine River
 Authority, or the Lower Neches Valley River Authority.
 SECTION 2. Section 552.912, Local Government Code, as added
 by this Act, applies to damages caused by the backup of a sanitary
 sewer system on or after March 1, 2007.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1174 was passed by the House on April
 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1174 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1174 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor