Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1232 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1232


 AN ACT
 relating to establishing a local behavioral health intervention
 pilot project.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) The Department of State Health Services
 shall establish a local behavioral health intervention pilot
 project for children in Bexar County.
 (b) In implementing the pilot project, the department shall
 require a local mental health authority serving Bexar County to:
 (1) enter into a memorandum of understanding or other
 agreement with state and local agencies that work directly with
 children, including the Department of State Health Services, the
 Department of Family and Protective Services, the Texas Youth
 Commission, and the Texas Education Agency, to:
 (A) permit collaboration in the provision of
 uniform early intervention behavioral health services to children;
 (B) identify children, with written consent from
 parents or guardians, who are at risk of placement in an alternative
 setting for behavior management, in accordance with behavioral
 standards established by the Texas Education Agency and local
 school district policy, or intervention by the juvenile justice or
 child protective services systems; and
 (C) with written consent from parents or
 guardians, divert children identified under Paragraph (B) to a
 system of care services to reduce gaps or inefficiencies in the
 provision of care;
 (2) develop, in collaboration with the state and local
 agencies, a best practices plan regarding:
 (A) informed consent and confidentiality
 practices;
 (B) a consent form:
 (i) by which parents may give or refuse
 consent to share information with a specific agency or provider
 that collaborates in the provision of treatment or service to a
 child;
 (ii) that informs a parent that the parent
 has the right to withhold consent and may withdraw consent at any
 time; and
 (iii) that informs the parent of the type of
 information that an agency or provider may share if the parent
 consents;
 (C) uniform referral processes between systems
 and agencies related to behavioral health services;
 (D) the delivery of early intervention and
 treatment services;
 (E) an information exchange process between
 agencies to facilitate faster identification and assessment of
 behavioral health problems and integrate service delivery; and
 (F) an information exchange process between each
 parent of a child participating in the pilot project and the
 agencies and providers involved in the project to assist the parent
 in remaining informed regarding the evaluations performed in
 relation to the child and any conclusions or recommended treatment
 options resulting from those evaluations or decisions that need to
 be made by the parent as a result of an evaluation;
 (3) identify outcome measures that may be used to
 measure the efficiency of coordination;
 (4) ensure that an extensive listing of providers is
 available for children and their families, including information
 regarding the services offered and the behavioral health issues
 addressed by the provider; and
 (5) ensure that parents, agencies, and providers
 participating in the pilot project are informed that a parent or
 child may not be penalized for refusing to consent to the
 information sharing or services under the pilot project.
 (c) In order to facilitate the pilot project and identify
 children in accordance with Subsection (b)(1)(B), a local mental
 health authority serving Bexar County, the Department of State
 Health Services, the Department of Family and Protective Services,
 the Texas Youth Commission, the Texas Education Agency, and local
 school districts may, with the consent of the child's parents or
 guardians:
 (1) disclose information relating to a child,
 including information concerning the child's identity, needs,
 treatment, social, criminal, and educational history, probation or
 supervision status and compliance with the conditions of the
 child's probation or supervision, and medical or mental health
 history, if the disclosure serves a purpose of the pilot project;
 (2) accept information relating to a child that serves
 a purpose of the pilot project, regardless of whether other state
 law makes that information confidential; and
 (3) before sharing information under this section,
 enter into a memorandum of understanding with another local or
 state governmental entity to specify:
 (A) the types of information that may be
 exchanged among agencies under this section without violating any
 applicable provisions of federal law, including any federal funding
 requirements; and
 (B) the protocols for information sharing,
 including methods for ensuring the continued protection of
 confidential information by the recipient of the information.
 (d) This section does not affect the confidential status of
 the information being shared.
 (e) The department may use funds for crisis prevention
 programs in collaboration with funds from local authorities,
 including school districts and criminal justice agencies, to
 implement the pilot project.
 (f) Not later than December 1, 2010, the local mental health
 authority involved in the pilot project shall submit a report to the
 department regarding the local behavioral health intervention
 pilot project, including:
 (1) a comprehensive analysis of the efficacy of the
 project; and
 (2) the local authority's findings and
 recommendations.
 (g) In implementing the pilot project, the Department of
 State Health Services shall ensure that a parent of a child involved
 in the project is provided with reasonable, standardized complaint
 procedures for making complaints regarding the pilot project or an
 agency or provider involved in the pilot project.
 (h) The Department of State Health Services shall ensure
 that the pilot project:
 (1) is operated without regard to the race, color,
 disability, sex, age, national origin, or religion of the
 individuals involved in the pilot project; and
 (2) does not disproportionately target or negatively
 impact minorities.
 (i) This section does not authorize the implementation of
 school-based mental health screening.
 (j) This Act expires September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1232 was passed by the House on April
 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1232 on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 2,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1232 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor