Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1257 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Legler, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 1257
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 15, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; May 15, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment in installments of ad valorem taxes on
 certain property owned by a business entity and located in a
 disaster area.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 31.032, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (a) This section applies only to:
 (1) real property that:
 (A) is:
 (i) the residence homestead of the owner or
 consists of property that is used for residential purposes and that
 has fewer than five living units; or
 (ii)  owned or leased by a business entity
 that had not more than the amount calculated as provided by
 Subsection (h) in gross receipts in the entity's most recent
 federal tax year or state franchise tax annual period, according to
 the applicable federal income tax return or state franchise tax
 report of the entity;
 (B) is located in a disaster area; and
 (C) has been damaged as a direct result of the
 disaster; [and]
 (2) tangible personal property that is owned or leased
 by a business entity described by Subdivision (1)(A)(ii); and
 (3) taxes that are imposed on the property by a taxing
 unit before the first anniversary of the disaster.
 (h)  For the 2009 tax year, the limit on gross receipts under
 Subsection (a)(1)(A)(ii) is $5 million.  For each subsequent tax
 year, the comptroller shall adjust the limit to reflect inflation
 by using the index that the comptroller considers to most
 accurately report changes in the purchasing power of the dollar for
 consumers in this state and shall publicize the adjusted limit.
 Each collector shall use the adjusted limit as calculated by the
 comptroller under this subsection to determine whether property is
 owned or leased by a business entity described by Subsection
 (a)(1)(A)(ii).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *