Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1259 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kolkhorst, et al. H.B. No. 1259
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1259By: Duncan By: Duncan
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to hiring outside legal counsel to provide legal services
 to the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 825.203, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 825.203. LEGAL REPRESENTATION [ADVISER]. (a) The
 attorney general of the state is the legal adviser of the board of
 trustees. The attorney general shall represent the board in all
 litigation.
 (b)  The board may not employ outside legal counsel to
 provide legal services to the retirement system except as provided
 by this section and Section 402.0212, regardless of the source of
 funds to be used to pay the outside counsel. For purposes of this
 section, "legal services" includes services provided by an attorney
 regarding ethics and fiduciary responsibilities.
 (c)  The attorney general shall timely act on a request to
 approve a contract for outside legal services under Section
 402.0212. If the attorney general denies the board's request for
 approval of a contract for outside legal services:
 (1)  the attorney general shall provide the board with
 the reason for the denial; and
 (2)  the board may select alternative outside legal
 counsel, subject to approval by the attorney general in accordance
 with this section and Section 402.0212.
 SECTION 2. Section 825.203(c), Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a request to approve a contract for
 outside legal services submitted by the Teacher Retirement System
 of Texas on or after the effective date of this Act. A request
 submitted before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the request was submitted and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *