Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1281 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R3337 JRJ-D
 By: McClendon H.B. No. 1281


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion in the foundation curriculum for public
 schools of instruction in certain skills development to prepare
 students for adult responsibility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 28.002(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) Each school district that offers kindergarten through
 grade 12 shall offer, as a required curriculum:
 (1) a foundation curriculum that includes:
 (A) English language arts;
 (B) mathematics;
 (C) science; [and]
 (D) social studies, consisting of Texas, United
 States, and world history, government, and geography; and
 (E) adult responsibility education; and
 (2) an enrichment curriculum that includes:
 (A) to the extent possible, languages other than
 English;
 (B) health, with emphasis on the importance of
 proper nutrition and exercise;
 (C) physical education;
 (D) fine arts;
 (E) economics, with emphasis on the free
 enterprise system and its benefits;
 (F) career and technology education;
 (G) technology applications; and
 (H) religious literature, including the Hebrew
 Scriptures (Old Testament) and New Testament, and its impact on
 history and literature.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.0024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0024.  ADVISORY PANEL REQUIRED TO DEVELOP CURRICULUM
 FOR ADULT RESPONSIBILITY.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2010, the
 agency shall establish an advisory panel under this section to
 develop the required foundation curriculum to teach students skills
 in social, emotional, and behavioral interaction to prepare
 students for adult responsibility. A primary purpose of the adult
 responsibility curriculum is to teach students advanced methods of
 thinking, speaking, learning, and reasoning, including methods
 for:
 (1) effective, nonviolent communication;
 (2) problem solving;
 (3)  setting appropriate boundaries and priorities;
 and
 (4) creative decision making.
 (b)  The commissioner shall appoint members to the advisory
 panel after consulting with the lieutenant governor, speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the chairs of standing committees of
 the senate and the house of representatives with primary
 jurisdiction over public education. The advisory panel shall
 consist of nine members as follows:
 (1)  three members who have professional or practical
 expertise or experience in social and emotional development and
 education;
 (2) three members who are active educators; and
 (3)  three members who are business representatives or
 members of the community.
 (c)  The appointed members of the advisory panel serve
 staggered three-year terms. The commissioner shall appoint the
 initial members to a three-year term. Following the initial term,
 the commissioner shall appoint the members to terms of one, two, or
 three years as necessary so that one-third of the appointed
 advisory panel members' terms expire each year.
 (d)  The commissioner shall designate one member of the
 advisory panel as the presiding officer.
 (e)  A member of the advisory panel serves on a voluntary
 basis without compensation.
 (f)  The advisory panel may begin meeting after the
 commissioner appoints at least five members to the panel.
 (g)  Not later than January 1, 2011, the advisory panel shall
 develop the curriculum as required by this section and report to the
 commissioner and the legislature as provided by this subsection.
 The report must include recommendations regarding:
 (1)  whether the adult responsibility curriculum
 should be incorporated into existing classes or provided in
 separate classes before, during, or after the school day;
 (2)  the professional requirements for educators who
 provide adult responsibility curriculum instruction;
 (3)  appropriate testing practices for measuring
 student progress in the adult responsibility curriculum; and
 (4)  other considerations as determined appropriate by
 the advisory panel.
 (h)  The commissioner shall report the recommendations
 provided under Subsection (g) to the State Board of Education.
 (i)  Not later than September 1, 2011, the State Board of
 Education by rule shall revise the essential knowledge and skills
 as provided by Section 28.002(c) to include the adult
 responsibility curriculum developed under this section based on the
 recommendations of the advisory panel under Subsection (g). The
 State Board of Education shall require school districts to provide
 instruction in the adult responsibility curriculum for:
 (1)  kindergarten through grade five beginning with the
 2012-2013 school year;
 (2)  grade six through grade eight beginning with the
 2014-2015 school year; and
 (3)  grade nine through grade 12 beginning with the
 2016-2017 school year.
 (j)  The advisory panel shall deliver a biennial report to
 the commissioner and the legislature that:
 (1)  assesses the state's progress in meeting the goals
 stated in the curriculum plans developed under this section; and
 (2)  recommends legislative action to assist the state
 in meeting those goals.
 (k) This section expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.