Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1286 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eiland (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1286
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 21, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2009,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of Save Our Beaches specialty license
 plates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.6275 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.6275.  SAVE OUR BEACHES LICENSE PLATES. (a) The
 department shall issue specialty license plates to support the
 coastal protection and improvement program.
 (b)  After deduction of the department's administrative
 costs, the remainder of the fee for issuance of the license plates
 shall be deposited to the credit of the coastal protection and
 improvement fund established by Section 33.653, Natural Resources
 Code, to fund the cleaning, maintaining, nourishing, and protecting
 of state beaches.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *