Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1290 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Oliveira, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1290
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 20, 2009, reported favorably, as amended, by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By: Lucio
 Amend H.B. No. 1290 (house engrossment) in SECTION 1 of the
 bill, by striking Section 1376.001(1)(B) (page 1, lines 45 through
 47) and substituting the following:
 (B)  a health benefit plan that offered by a
 multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds a certificate of
 authority under Chapter 846;
 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 2 By: Lucio
 Amend H.B. No. 1290 (house engrossment) in SECTION 1 of the bill, by
 striking Sec. 1376.001 (D)(3) (page 1, lines 58 through 60).
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to health benefit plan coverage for certain tests for the
 early detection of cardiovascular disease.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle E, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1376 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1376. CERTAIN TESTS FOR EARLY DETECTION OF CARDIOVASCULAR
 DISEASE
 Sec. 1376.001.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a) This chapter
 applies only to a health benefit plan that:
 (1)  provides benefits for medical or surgical expenses
 incurred as a result of a health condition, accident, or sickness,
 including:
 (A)  an individual, group, blanket, or franchise
 insurance policy or insurance agreement, a group hospital service
 contract, or an individual or group evidence of coverage that is
 offered by:
 (i) an insurance company;
 (ii)  a group hospital service corporation
 operating under Chapter 842;
 (iii)  a fraternal benefit society operating
 under Chapter 885;
 (iv)  a Lloyd's plan operating under Chapter
 941;
 (v)  a stipulated premium company operating
 under Chapter 884; or
 (vi)  a health maintenance organization
 operating under Chapter 843;
 (B)  to the extent permitted by the Employee
 Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (29 U.S.C. Section 1001 et
 seq.), a health benefit plan that is offered by:
 (i)  a multiple employer welfare arrangement
 as defined by Section 3 of that Act (29 U.S.C. Section 1002); or
 (ii)  another analogous benefit
 arrangement;
 (C)  a small employer health benefit plan written
 under Chapter 1501; or
 (D)  a Medicare supplemental policy as defined by
 Section 1882(g)(1), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395ss);
 (2)  is offered by an approved nonprofit health
 corporation operating under Chapter 844; or
 (3)  provides health and accident coverage through a
 risk pool created under Chapter 172, Local Government Code,
 notwithstanding Section 172.014, Local Government Code.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any provision in Chapter 1601 or any
 other law, this chapter applies to basic coverage under Chapter
 1601.
 Sec. 1376.002. EXCEPTIONS. This chapter does not apply to:
 (1) a plan that provides coverage:
 (A)  only for a specified disease or other limited
 benefit;
 (B) only for accidental death or dismemberment;
 (C)  for wages or payments in lieu of wages for a
 period during which an employee is absent from work because of
 sickness or injury;
 (D)  as a supplement to a liability insurance
 policy; or
 (E) only for indemnity for hospital confinement;
 (2)  a standard health benefit plan issued under
 Chapter 1507;
 (3) a workers' compensation insurance policy;
 (4)  medical payment insurance coverage provided under
 a motor vehicle insurance policy; or
 (5)  a long-term care policy, including a nursing home
 fixed indemnity policy, unless the commissioner determines that the
 policy provides benefit coverage so comprehensive that the policy
 is a health benefit plan as described by Section 1376.001.
 Sec. 1376.003.  MINIMUM COVERAGE REQUIRED. (a) A health
 benefit plan that provides coverage for screening medical
 procedures must provide the minimum coverage required by this
 section to each covered individual:
 (1) who is:
 (A)  a male older than 45 years of age and younger
 than 76 years of age; or
 (B)  a female older than 55 years of age and
 younger than 76 years of age; and
 (2) who:
 (A) is diabetic; or
 (B)  has a risk of developing coronary heart
 disease, based on a score derived using the Framingham Heart Study
 coronary prediction algorithm, that is intermediate or higher.
 (b)  The minimum coverage required to be provided under this
 section is coverage of up to $200 for one of the following
 noninvasive screening tests for atherosclerosis and abnormal
 artery structure and function every five years, performed by a
 laboratory that is certified by a national organization recognized
 by the commissioner by rule for the purposes of this section:
 (1)  computed tomography (CT) scanning measuring
 coronary artery calcification; or
 (2)  ultrasonography measuring carotid intima-media
 thickness and plaque.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a health benefit plan delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed
 on or after January 1, 2010. A health benefit plan delivered,
 issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2010, is governed
 by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this
 Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *