Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1322 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hochberg (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1322
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of an online resource for teachers of
 students with special health needs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter J, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.463 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.463.  RESOURCES FOR TEACHERS OF STUDENTS WITH
 SPECIAL HEALTH NEEDS.  The agency, in coordination with the Health
 and Human Services Commission, shall establish and maintain an
 Internet website to provide resources for teachers who teach
 students with special health needs.  The agency shall include on the
 website information about:
 (1)  the treatment and management of chronic illnesses
 and how such illnesses impact a student's well-being or ability to
 succeed in school; and
 (2)  food allergies that are common among students,
 including information about preventing exposure to a specific food
 when necessary to protect a student's health and information about
 treating a student suffering from an allergic reaction to a food.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *