Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1322 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1322


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of an online resource for teachers of
 students with special health needs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter J, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.463 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.463.  RESOURCES FOR TEACHERS OF STUDENTS WITH
 SPECIAL HEALTH NEEDS.  The agency, in coordination with the Health
 and Human Services Commission, shall establish and maintain an
 Internet website to provide resources for teachers who teach
 students with special health needs.  The agency shall include on the
 website information about:
 (1)  the treatment and management of chronic illnesses
 and how such illnesses impact a student's well-being or ability to
 succeed in school; and
 (2)  food allergies that are common among students,
 including information about preventing exposure to a specific food
 when necessary to protect a student's health and information about
 treating a student suffering from an allergic reaction to a food.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1322 was passed by the House on April
 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1322 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1322 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1322 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1322 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor