Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1342 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Menendez, Thompson (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 1342
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 7, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 7, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1342 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to adoption of certain information technology.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle J, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1661 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1661.  INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY
 Sec. 1661.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Health benefit plan" means a plan that provides
 benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a
 health condition, accident, or sickness, including an individual,
 group, blanket, or franchise insurance policy or insurance
 agreement, a group hospital service contract, or an individual or
 group evidence of coverage that is offered by:
 (A) an insurance company;
 (B)  a group hospital service corporation
 operating under Chapter 842;
 (C)  a fraternal benefit society operating under
 Chapter 885;
 (D)  a stipulated premium company operating under
 Chapter 884;
 (E) a Lloyd's plan operating under Chapter 941;
 (F) an exchange operating under Chapter 942;
 (G)  a health maintenance organization operating
 under Chapter 843;
 (H)  a multiple employer welfare arrangement that
 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 846;
 (I)  an approved nonprofit health corporation
 that holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844; or
 (J)  an entity not authorized under this code or
 another insurance law of this state that contracts directly for
 health care services on a risk-sharing basis, including a
 capitation basis.
 (2)  "Health benefit plan issuer" means an entity
 authorized to issue a health benefit plan in this state.
 (3) "Health care provider" means:
 (A)  an individual who is licensed, certified, or
 otherwise authorized to provide health care services; or
 (B)  a hospital, emergency clinic, outpatient
 clinic, or other facility providing health care services.
 (4)  "Participating provider" means a health care
 provider who has contracted with a health benefit plan issuer to
 provide services to enrollees.
 Sec. 1661.002.  USE OF CERTAIN INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY
 REQUIRED.  (a)  A health benefit plan issuer shall use information
 technology that provides a participating provider with real-time
 information at the point of care concerning:
 (1) the enrollee's:
 (A) copayment and coinsurance;
 (B) applicable deductibles; and
 (C) covered benefits and services; and
 (2)  the enrollee's estimated total financial
 responsibility for the care.
 (b)  A health benefit plan issuer shall use information
 technology that provides an enrollee with information concerning
 the enrollee's:
 (1) copayment and coinsurance;
 (2) applicable deductibles;
 (3) covered benefits and services; and
 (4)  estimated financial responsibility for the health
 care provided to the enrollee.
 (c)  Nothing in this section may be interpreted as a
 guarantee of payment for health care services.
 (d)  A health benefit plan issuer's Internet website may be
 used to meet the information technology requirements of this
 chapter.
 Sec. 1661.003. EXCEPTIONS. This chapter does not apply to:
 (1) a health benefit plan that provides coverage only:
 (A)  for a specified disease or diseases or under
 a limited benefit policy;
 (B) for accidental death or dismemberment;
 (C)  as a supplement to a liability insurance
 policy; or
 (D) for dental or vision care;
 (2) disability income insurance coverage;
 (3) credit insurance coverage;
 (4) a hospital confinement indemnity policy;
 (5)  a Medicare supplemental policy as defined by
 Section 1882(g)(1), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395ss);
 (6) a workers' compensation insurance policy;
 (7)  medical payment insurance coverage provided under
 a motor vehicle insurance policy;
 (8)  a long-term care insurance policy, including a
 nursing home fixed indemnity policy, unless the commissioner
 determines that the policy provides benefits so comprehensive that
 the policy is a health benefit plan and should not be subject to the
 exemption provided under this section;
 (9)  the child health plan program under Chapter 62,
 Health and Safety Code, or the health benefits plan for children
 under Chapter 63, Health and Safety Code; or
 (10)  a Medicaid managed care program operated under
 Chapter 533, Government Code, or a Medicaid program operated under
 Chapter 32, Human Resources Code.
 Sec. 1661.004.  REQUIRED USE OF TECHNOLOGY BY PROVIDERS.  A
 physician, hospital, or other health care provider shall use
 information technology as required under this chapter beginning not
 later than September 1, 2013.
 Sec. 1661.005.  REFUND OF OVERPAYMENT.  A physician,
 hospital, or other health care provider that receives an
 overpayment from an enrollee must refund the amount of the
 overpayment to the enrollee not later than the 30th day after the
 date the physician, hospital, or health care provider determines
 that an overpayment has been made. This section does not apply to an
 overpayment subject to Section 843.350 or 1301.132.
 Sec. 1661.006.  HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN ISSUER CONDUCT.  A
 contract between a health benefit plan issuer and a physician,
 hospital, or other health care provider may not prohibit the
 physician, hospital, or health care provider from collecting, at
 the time of care, the estimated amount for which the enrollee may be
 financially responsible.
 Sec. 1661.007.  CERTAIN FEES PROHIBITED.  A health benefit
 plan issuer may not directly charge or collect from an enrollee or a
 physician, or other health care provider, a fee to cover the costs
 incurred by the health benefit plan issuer in complying with this
 chapter.
 Sec. 1661.008.  WAIVER.  (a)  A health benefit plan issuer
 may apply to the commissioner for a waiver of the requirement under
 this chapter to use information technology.
 (b)  The commissioner by rule shall identify circumstances
 that justify a waiver, including:
 (1)  undue hardship, including financial or
 operational hardship;
 (2)  the geographical area in which the health benefit
 plan issuer operates;
 (3)  the number of enrollees covered by a health
 benefit plan issuer; and
 (4) other special circumstances.
 (c)  The commissioner shall approve or deny a waiver
 application under this section not later than the 60th day after the
 date of receipt of the application.
 (d) This section expires January 1, 2012.
 Sec. 1661.009.  RULES.  (a) The commissioner shall adopt
 rules as necessary to implement this chapter, including rules that
 ensure that the information technology used by a health benefit
 plan issuer does not have legal or technical restrictions for
 encoding, displaying, exchanging, reading, printing, transmitting,
 or storing information or data in electronic form.
 (b)  Rules adopted by the commissioner must be consistent
 with national standards established by the Workgroup for Electronic
 Data Interchange or by other similar organizations recognized by
 the commissioner.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 * * * * *