Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB136 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R2263 CAE-D
 By: Villarreal H.B. No. 136


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing notification to parents of eligible children
 of the availability of prekindergarten classes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.1534 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.1534.  NOTIFICATION OF PREKINDERGARTEN CLASSES. (a)
 The agency shall develop joint strategies with other state agencies
 regarding methods to increase community awareness of
 prekindergarten programs through programs that provide information
 relating to public assistance programs.
 (b)  Each school district shall report annually to the agency
 the strategies implemented by the school district to increase
 community awareness of prekindergarten programs offered by the
 district. The district shall report the information on a form
 prescribed by the commissioner.
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2010, the agency shall conduct
 a study to identify effective methods to communicate to the parent
 of an eligible child the availability of prekindergarten classes.
 The study must include research on providing information regarding
 prekindergarten classes through public, private, and nonprofit
 institutions that provide assistance and support to families with
 children eligible for prekindergarten classes. Not later than
 February 1, 2010, the agency shall make recommendations to school
 districts based on the study regarding the most effective methods
 to increase communication regarding the availability of
 prekindergarten classes. This subsection expires March 1, 2010.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2010, the agency shall
 prepare and deliver to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each
 legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over
 primary and secondary education a report detailing strategies
 developed under Subsection (a) to increase community awareness of
 prekindergarten programs. This subsection expires January 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.