Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB136 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R17978 CAE-D
 By: Villarreal, Marquez, Patrick, Walle, H.B. No. 136
 Ortiz, Jr., et al.
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 136:
 By: Aycock C.S.H.B. No. 136


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing notification to parents of eligible children
 of the availability of prekindergarten programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.1534 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.1534.  NOTIFICATION OF PREKINDERGARTEN PROGRAMS.
 (a)  In this section, "prekindergarten program" includes
 prekindergarten programs provided by a private entity through a
 partnership with the school district.
 (b)  The agency shall develop joint strategies with other
 state agencies regarding methods to increase community awareness of
 prekindergarten programs through programs that provide information
 relating to public assistance programs.
 (c)  Each school district shall report annually to the agency
 the strategies implemented by the school district to increase
 community awareness of prekindergarten programs offered by the
 district. The district shall report the information on a form
 prescribed by the commissioner.  A report required by this
 subsection may be combined, at the discretion of the commissioner,
 with another report that the district submits to the agency.
 (d)  Not later than the 90th day after the date the agency
 receives a report from a school district as required by Subsection
 (c), the agency shall post the report on the agency's Internet
 website.
 (e)  Not later than January 1, 2010, the agency shall conduct
 a study to identify effective methods to communicate to the parent
 of an eligible child the availability of prekindergarten programs.
 The study must include research on providing information regarding
 prekindergarten programs through public, private, and nonprofit
 institutions that provide assistance and support to families with
 children eligible for prekindergarten programs. Not later than
 February 1, 2010, the agency shall make recommendations to school
 districts based on the study regarding the most effective methods
 to increase communication regarding the availability of
 prekindergarten programs. This subsection expires March 1, 2010.
 (f)  Not later than December 1, 2010, the agency shall
 prepare and deliver to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each
 legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over
 primary and secondary education a report detailing strategies
 developed under Subsection (b) to increase community awareness of
 prekindergarten programs. This subsection expires January 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.