Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1375 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 1375
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 25, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1375 By: Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to staff development training for certain public school
 personnel regarding student disciplinary procedures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 37, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 37.0181 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.0181.  STAFF DEVELOPMENT REGARDING DISCIPLINARY
 PROCEDURES.
 (a)  Each principal or other appropriate administrator who
 oversees student discipline shall, at least once every three (3)
 school years, attend staff development training regarding
 Subchapter A, Chapter 37, including information relating to the
 distinction between a discipline management technique used at the
 principal's discretion under Section 37.002(a) and the
 discretionary authority of a teacher to remove a disruptive student
 under Section 37.002(b).
 (b)  Staff development training under this section may be
 provided in coordination with regional education service centers
 through the use of distance learning methods, such as
 telecommunications networks, and using available agency resources.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *