Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1466 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Swinford (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1466
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 8, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 8, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the theft of a military grave marker.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 31.03(e), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (e) Except as provided by Subsection (f), an offense under
 this section is:
 (1) a Class C misdemeanor if the value of the property
 stolen is less than:
 (A) $50; or
 (B) $20 and the defendant obtained the property
 by issuing or passing a check or similar sight order in a manner
 described by Section 31.06;
 (2) a Class B misdemeanor if:
 (A) the value of the property stolen is:
 (i) $50 or more but less than $500; or
 (ii) $20 or more but less than $500 and the
 defendant obtained the property by issuing or passing a check or
 similar sight order in a manner described by Section 31.06; or
 (B) the value of the property stolen is less
 than:
 (i) $50 and the defendant has previously
 been convicted of any grade of theft; or
 (ii) $20, the defendant has previously been
 convicted of any grade of theft, and the defendant obtained the
 property by issuing or passing a check or similar sight order in a
 manner described by Section 31.06;
 (3) a Class A misdemeanor if the value of the property
 stolen is $500 or more but less than $1,500;
 (4) a state jail felony if:
 (A) the value of the property stolen is $1,500 or
 more but less than $20,000, or the property is less than 10 head of
 cattle, horses, or exotic livestock or exotic fowl as defined by
 Section 142.001, Agriculture Code, or any part thereof under the
 value of $20,000, or less than 100 head of sheep, swine, or goats or
 any part thereof under the value of $20,000;
 (B) regardless of value, the property is stolen
 from the person of another or from a human corpse or grave,
 including property that is a military grave marker;
 (C) the property stolen is a firearm, as defined
 by Section 46.01;
 (D) the value of the property stolen is less than
 $1,500 and the defendant has been previously convicted two or more
 times of any grade of theft;
 (E) the property stolen is an official ballot or
 official carrier envelope for an election; or
 (F) the value of the property stolen is less than
 $20,000 and the property stolen is insulated or noninsulated wire
 or cable that consists of at least 50 percent:
 (i) aluminum;
 (ii) bronze; or
 (iii) copper;
 (5) a felony of the third degree if the value of the
 property stolen is $20,000 or more but less than $100,000, or the
 property is:
 (A) 10 or more head of cattle, horses, or exotic
 livestock or exotic fowl as defined by Section 142.001, Agriculture
 Code, stolen during a single transaction and having an aggregate
 value of less than $100,000; or
 (B) 100 or more head of sheep, swine, or goats
 stolen during a single transaction and having an aggregate value of
 less than $100,000;
 (6) a felony of the second degree if the value of the
 property stolen is $100,000 or more but less than $200,000; or
 (7) a felony of the first degree if the value of the
 property stolen is $200,000 or more.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *