Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1505 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ortiz, Jr., Guillen H.B. No. 1505
 (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2009;
 April 23, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 6, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the promotion or advertising of alcoholic beverages in
 relation to certain facilities owned by a municipality or county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 108, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, is amended by adding Section 108.755 to read as follows:
 Sec. 108.755.  CERTAIN GOVERNMENTALLY OWNED FACILITIES. (a)
 Section 108.75 does not restrict or govern the promotion,
 sponsorship, or advertising of an entertainment event, or the
 promotion or advertising of an alcoholic beverage brand or product,
 at a facility owned by a municipality or county that is financed
 with public securities, the interest on which is exempt from
 federal income taxation under the Internal Revenue Code of 1986.
 (b)  Financial arrangements, including profit sharing,
 between a concessionaire operating at a facility described by
 Subsection (a) and a person operating the concession facilities
 under a contract with the license or permit holder or the
 municipality or county do not constitute and are not evidence of
 subterfuge ownership prohibited by Section 109.53.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *