Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1579 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gonzales (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1579
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on
 Flooding and Evacuations; May 11, 2009, rereferred to Committee on
 International Relations and Trade; May 14, 2009, reported favorably
 by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a county's removal of flood water resulting from a
 natural disaster in certain communities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 561, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 561.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 561.010.  PROVISION OF FLOOD RELIEF TO COLONIAS. (a) In
 this section, "colonia" means a geographic area that consists of 11
 or more dwellings located in close proximity to each other in an
 area that may be described as a community or neighborhood and that:
 (1)  has a majority population composed of individuals
 and families of low income, as defined by Section 2306.004,
 Government Code, and based on the federal Office of Management and
 Budget poverty index, and meets the qualifications of an
 economically distressed area under Section 17.921, Water Code; or
 (2)  has the physical and economic characteristics of a
 colonia, as determined by the Texas Department of Housing and
 Community Affairs.
 (b)  A county may provide assistance for the removal from
 private property, including a road, of flood water resulting from a
 natural disaster in a colonia if the removal of the water is
 necessary to protect the health and safety of the colonia.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *