Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1654 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Anchia (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 1654
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1654 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of high school deputy registrars in
 certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 13.046, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), each [Each]
 principal of a public or private high school or the principal's
 designee shall serve as a deputy registrar for the county in which
 the school is located.
 (a-1)  This subsection applies only to a public or private
 high school that is located in a county with a population of 100,000
 or more and that has five or more employees. Each principal of a
 high school shall designate four people who are employees of the
 high school or employees of the district in which the high school is
 located and serving at the high school to serve as deputy registrars
 for the county in which the school is located.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *