Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1720 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 1720
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 19, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1720 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of public funds by a political subdivision for
 communications that contain false information relating to a ballot
 measure; providing a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 255.003, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b) Subsection (a) [This section] does not apply to a
 communication that factually describes the purposes of a measure if
 the communication does not advocate passage or defeat of the
 measure.
 (b-1)  An officer or employee of a political subdivision may
 not spend or authorize the spending of public funds for a
 communication describing a measure if the communication contains
 information that:
 (1) the officer or employee knows is false; and
 (2)  is sufficiently substantial and important as to be
 reasonably likely to influence a voter to vote for or against the
 measure.
 (c) A person who violates Subsection (a) or (b-1) [this
 section] commits an offense. An offense under this section is a
 Class A misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2. Section 255.003, Election Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to an expenditure of public funds that is
 made on or after September 1, 2009. An expenditure of public funds
 that is made before September 1, 2009, is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the expenditure is made, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *