Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1721 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bohac, Leibowitz (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 1721
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to taking or attempting to take a weapon from an employee
 or official of a correctional facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Section 38.14, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.14. TAKING OR ATTEMPTING TO TAKE WEAPON FROM PEACE
 OFFICER, EMPLOYEE OR OFFICIAL OF CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, PAROLE
 OFFICER, OR COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT
 OFFICER.
 SECTION 2. Sections 38.14(b), (c), (d), and (e), Penal
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b) A person commits an offense if the person intentionally
 or knowingly and with force takes or attempts to take from a peace
 officer, employee or official of a correctional facility, parole
 officer, or community supervision and corrections department
 officer the officer's, employee's, or official's firearm,
 nightstick, stun gun, or personal protection chemical dispensing
 device with the intention of harming the officer, employee, or
 official or a third person.
 (c) The actor is presumed to have known that the peace
 officer, employee or official of a correctional facility, parole
 officer, or community supervision and corrections department
 officer was a peace officer, employee or official of a correctional
 facility, parole officer, or community supervision and corrections
 department officer if:
 (1) the officer, employee, or official was wearing a
 distinctive uniform or badge indicating his employment;[,] or
 (2) [if] the officer, employee, or official identified
 himself as a peace officer, employee or official of a correctional
 facility, parole officer, or community supervision and corrections
 department officer.
 (d) It is a defense to prosecution under this section that
 the defendant took or attempted to take the weapon from a peace
 officer, employee or official of a correctional facility, parole
 officer, or community supervision and corrections department
 officer who was using force against the defendant or another in
 excess of the amount of force permitted by law.
 (e) An offense under this section is:
 (1) a felony of the third degree, if the defendant took
 a weapon described by Subsection (b) from an officer, employee, or
 official described by that subsection; [Subsection (b)] and
 (2) [is] a state jail felony, if the defendant
 attempted to take a [the] weapon described by Subsection (b) from an
 [the] officer, employee, or official described by that subsection.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect at the time the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *