Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1731 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Pitts, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Ogden) H.B. No. 1731
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 7, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 7, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to money available for consumer incentive or rebate
 programs for alternatively fueled appliances or equipment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 113.2435, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c)(5), the commission shall
 make available for rebates during a fiscal year the entire amount of
 money made available for rebates during the preceding fiscal year
 that was not spent during the preceding fiscal year. The amount of
 money made available for rebates during the preceding fiscal year
 that was not spent during the preceding fiscal year is not counted
 in determining the limitation on the proportion of the fund usable
 for the rebate program during a fiscal year.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *