Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1738 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R9156 BEF-F
 By: Howard of Travis H.B. No. 1738


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study of nursing educational programs that require a
 single clinical competency assessment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.1571 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.1571.  STUDY OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMS REQUIRING
 SINGLE CLINICAL COMPETENCY ASSESSMENT. (a) The board shall study
 whether graduates of a nursing educational program that requires
 students to pass only a single clinical competency assessment are
 able after graduation to practice in a clinical setting at a level
 substantially equivalent to the graduates of a nursing educational
 program that requires students to complete a required number of
 supervised clinical learning experiences involving multiple,
 ongoing assessments and feedback.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the board may consider a
 nursing educational program that requires students to pass only a
 single clinical competency assessment only if the program:
 (1)  has been requiring only a single clinical
 competency assessment for at least 10 years;
 (2) has students who reside in this state;
 (3)  has graduates who have been considered by the
 board to be eligible to apply for a registered nurse license as a
 result of graduating from the program on or before January 1, 2007;
 and
 (4)  conducts the single clinical competency
 assessment at a facility located in this state under the
 supervision of a registered nurse who holds a master's or doctoral
 degree in nursing and who has at least five years of experience on
 the faculty of a nursing program approved to operate in this state.
 (c)  If a nursing educational program that requires students
 to pass only a single clinical competency assessment has students
 who are already licensed registered nurses, the study may consider
 only students who are not already licensed registered nurses.
 (d)  The board shall begin the study, including the research
 design and the compilation of results, not later than January 1,
 2010, and shall conclude the study not later than June 30, 2012,
 except that the board may extend the study until June 30, 2014, if
 additional time is needed to complete the study or compile the
 results.
 (e)  If the study finds that graduates of a nursing
 educational program that requires students to pass only a single
 clinical competency assessment are not able after graduation to
 practice in a clinical setting at a level substantially equivalent
 to the graduates of a nursing educational program that requires
 students to complete a required number of supervised clinical
 learning experiences, the board shall allow a program participating
 in the study to modify its program, not later than December 31,
 2017, to meet any standards required for graduates of the program to
 be eligible to apply to the board for a license. The board may not
 disqualify graduates of a program that is modifying its program
 under this subsection from receiving a license under this chapter
 before December 31, 2017.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.