Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1739 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Howard of Travis (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 1739
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 20, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a recognition week to celebrate Texas native plants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.154 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.154.  TEXAS NATIVE PLANT WEEK. (a) The third full
 week in October is Texas Native Plant Week to celebrate the native
 plants of Texas.
 (b)  Texas Native Plant Week may be regularly observed in
 public schools and other places with programs to appreciate,
 explore, and study Texas native plants.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *