Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1761 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 1761
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 30, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 7, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 7, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1761 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reserve requirements for credit life and credit
 accident and health insurance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 425.058(l), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (l)(1) Notwithstanding any other law, the minimum reserve
 requirements applicable to a credit life policy issued under
 Chapter 1153 before January 1, 2009, are met if, in the aggregate,
 the reserves are maintained at 100 percent of the 1980
 Commissioner's Standard Ordinary Mortality Table, with interest
 that does not exceed 5.5 percent. [This subsection expires
 September 1, 2013.]
 (2)  For credit life policy reserves on contracts
 issued to be effective on or after January 1, 2009, the reserve
 requirements shall be based on minimum reserve standards
 established by the commissioner by rule. The commissioner shall
 adopt the rules based on either:
 (A)  the 2001 CSO Male Composite Ultimate
 Mortality Table for male and female insureds; or
 (B)  another CSO Mortality Table approved by the
 National Association of Insurance Commissioners on or after January
 1, 2009, for use on credit life policy reserves.
 (3)  For a single premium credit accident and health
 contract issued on or after January 1, 2009, the reserve
 requirements shall be based on minimum reserve standards
 established by the commissioner by rule. The commissioner shall
 adopt the rules based on either:
 (A)  the 1985 Commissioners Individual Disability
 Table A (85CIDA); or
 (B)  another Commissioner's Disability Table
 approved by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners on
 or after January 1, 2009, for use on credit accident and health
 policy reserves.
 (4)  For all credit insurance contracts, if the net
 premium refund liability exceeds the aggregate recorded contract
 reserve, the insurer shall establish an additional reserve
 liability that is equal to the excess of the net refund liability
 over the contract reserve recorded. The net refund liability may
 include consideration of commission, premium tax, and other
 expenses recoverable.
 (5)  In addition to the rules required to be adopted
 under this subsection, the commissioner may adopt other rules to
 implement this subsection.
 SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies to
 all credit life and credit accident and health insurance policies
 issued on or after January 1, 2009.
 (b) The commissioner of insurance shall adopt rules as
 required to implement Section 425.058(l), Insurance Code, as
 amended by this Act, not later than the 120th day after the
 effective date of this Act. Until rules are adopted as required by
 this subsection, insurers shall continue to use the minimum reserve
 standards under Section 425.058(l), Insurance Code, as that section
 existed immediately before amendment by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *