Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1795 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Pierson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1795
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2009;
 May 18, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 21, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to newborn screening and the creation of the Newborn
 Screening Advisory Committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. This Act may be cited as "Greyson's Law" in
 memory of Greyson Morris.
 SECTION 2. Section 33.011(a-1), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1) Except as provided by this subsection and to [To] the
 extent funding is available for the screening, the department shall
 require newborn screening tests to screen for disorders listed in
 the core [uniform] panel and in the secondary targets of the uniform
 newborn screening panel [conditions] recommended in the 2005 report
 by the American College of Medical Genetics entitled "Newborn
 Screening: Toward a Uniform Screening Panel and System" or another
 report determined by the department to provide more stringent [more
 appropriate] newborn screening guidelines to protect the health and
 welfare of this state's newborns. The department, with the advice
 of the Newborn Screening Advisory Committee, may require additional
 newborn screening tests under this subsection to screen for other
 disorders or conditions. The department may exclude from the
 newborn screening tests required under this subsection screenings
 for galactose epimerase and galactokinase.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 33, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 33.017 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.017.  NEWBORN SCREENING ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a)
 The department shall establish the Newborn Screening Advisory
 Committee.
 (b)  The advisory committee consists of members appointed by
 the commissioner of state health services. The advisory committee
 must include the following members:
 (1) health care providers;
 (2) a hospital representative;
 (3)  persons who have family members affected by a
 condition for which newborn screening is or may be required under
 this subchapter; and
 (4)  persons who are involved in the delivery of
 newborn screening services, follow-up, or treatment in this state.
 (c)  The advisory committee shall advise the department
 regarding strategic planning, policy, rules, and services related
 to newborn screening and additional newborn screening tests.
 (d)  The advisory committee shall adopt bylaws governing the
 committee's operations.
 (e) The advisory committee may appoint subcommittees.
 (f)  The advisory committee shall meet at least three times
 each year and at other times at the call of the commissioner of
 state health services.
 (g)  A member of the advisory committee is not entitled to
 compensation, but is entitled to reimbursement for travel or other
 expenses incurred by the member while conducting the business of
 the advisory committee, as provided by the General Appropriations
 Act.
 (h)  The advisory committee is not subject to Chapter 2110,
 Government Code.
 SECTION 4. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act, the commissioner of state health services shall
 appoint members to the Newborn Screening Advisory Committee as
 required under Section 33.017, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act.
 (b) Notwithstanding Section 33.011, Health and Safety Code,
 as amended by this Act, a physician or person attending the delivery
 of a newborn child is not required to subject the child to the
 additional newborn screening tests required under Section
 33.011(a-1), Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, until
 January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *