Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1799 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bohac, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 1799
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information that must be included on certain electric
 bills.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.116 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.116.  NOTICE REGARDING CUSTOMER CHOICE INFORMATION.
 A retail electric provider shall include on each residential
 customer's bill a statement, in at least 12-point type on the front
 of the first page, that reads: "For more information about
 residential electric service please visit www.powertochoose.com."
 This section expires September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *