Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1801 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bohac, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Shapiro) H.B. No. 1801
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2009;
 May 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 13,
 Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exemptions from the sales tax for a limited period for
 certain backpacks and school supplies specified by the Streamlined
 Sales and Use Tax Agreement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 151.327, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 151.327. SCHOOL SUPPLIES AND SCHOOL BACKPACKS BEFORE
 START OF SCHOOL. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Backpack" means a messenger bag, book bag, or a
 pack with straps that a person wears on the person's back, including
 a backpack with wheels if the backpack can also be worn on the back.
 The term does not include an item that is commonly considered
 luggage, a briefcase, an athletic bag, a duffle bag, a gym bag, a
 computer bag, a purse, or a framed backpack.
 (2)  "School supply" has the meaning assigned by the
 Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement adopted November 12, 2002,
 including all amendments made to the agreement on or before
 December 14, 2006.
 (a-1) The sale or storage, use, or other consumption of a
 school supply or a school backpack is exempted from the taxes
 imposed by this chapter if the school supply or backpack is
 purchased:
 (1) for use by a student in a public or private
 elementary or secondary school;
 (2) during the period described by Section
 151.326(a)(2); and
 (3) for a sales price of less than $100.
 (b) A retailer is not required to obtain an exemption
 certificate stating that school supplies or school backpacks are
 purchased for use by students in a public or private elementary or
 secondary school unless the school supplies or backpacks are
 purchased in a quantity that indicates that the school supplies or
 backpacks are not purchased for use by students in a public or
 private elementary or secondary school.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect taxes imposed before the effective date of this Act, and the
 law in effect before the effective date of this Act is continued in
 effect for purposes of the liability for and collection of those
 taxes.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect July 1, 2009, if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for effect on that
 date, this Act takes effect October 1, 2009.
 * * * * *