Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1821 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 20, 2009      TO: Honorable Todd Smith, Chair, House Committee on Elections      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1821 by Davis, John (Relating to requiring a voter to be affiliated with a political party to vote in that party's primary election or otherwise participate in that party's affairs.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would establish criteria for establishing party affiliation and participation in the party's affairs. Changes to voter registration forms, candidate forms, and voter educational materials would need to be made but it is assumed these costs could be absorbed within existing agency resources.The bill would repeal Sections 162.004, 162.005, 162.006, 162.007, 162.008, 162.009, 162.011, 162.012, 172.1141, and 172.125 of the Election Code. The bill would be effective September 1, 2009 except for Section 18.005(a) would be effective December 1, 2009 and Section 15.001(a) would be effective January 1, 2010. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:307 Secretary of State   LBB Staff:  JOB, TP, BTA    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 20, 2009





  TO: Honorable Todd Smith, Chair, House Committee on Elections      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1821 by Davis, John (Relating to requiring a voter to be affiliated with a political party to vote in that party's primary election or otherwise participate in that party's affairs.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Todd Smith, Chair, House Committee on Elections
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1821 by Davis, John (Relating to requiring a voter to be affiliated with a political party to vote in that party's primary election or otherwise participate in that party's affairs.), As Introduced

 Honorable Todd Smith, Chair, House Committee on Elections 

 Honorable Todd Smith, Chair, House Committee on Elections 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1821 by Davis, John (Relating to requiring a voter to be affiliated with a political party to vote in that party's primary election or otherwise participate in that party's affairs.), As Introduced

HB1821 by Davis, John (Relating to requiring a voter to be affiliated with a political party to vote in that party's primary election or otherwise participate in that party's affairs.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would establish criteria for establishing party affiliation and participation in the party's affairs. Changes to voter registration forms, candidate forms, and voter educational materials would need to be made but it is assumed these costs could be absorbed within existing agency resources.The bill would repeal Sections 162.004, 162.005, 162.006, 162.007, 162.008, 162.009, 162.011, 162.012, 172.1141, and 172.125 of the Election Code. The bill would be effective September 1, 2009 except for Section 18.005(a) would be effective December 1, 2009 and Section 15.001(a) would be effective January 1, 2010.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 307 Secretary of State

307 Secretary of State

LBB Staff: JOB, TP, BTA

 JOB, TP, BTA