Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB183 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 24, 2009      TO: Honorable Joe Deshotel, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB183 by Alonzo (Relating to the minimum wage.), As Introduced    No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require employers to pay each employee not less than the greater of $6.15 an hour or the federal minimum wage.   The federal minimum wage was increased to $6.55 per hour effective July 24, 2008. The federal minimum wage is scheduled to increase to $7.25 per hour on July 24, 2009. Since the federal minimum wage as of September 1, 2009 will be greater than required minimum of $6.15, the bill does not have a fiscal impact Local Government Impact Local workforce development boards are covered by the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 and are exempt from compliance with the provisions of the bill; therefore, no fiscal implication to local workforce development boards is anticipated.     Source Agencies:303 Facilities Commission, 320 Texas Workforce Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 601 Department of Transportation   LBB Staff:  JOB, JRO, MB, TP    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 24, 2009





  TO: Honorable Joe Deshotel, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB183 by Alonzo (Relating to the minimum wage.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joe Deshotel, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB183 by Alonzo (Relating to the minimum wage.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joe Deshotel, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry 

 Honorable Joe Deshotel, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB183 by Alonzo (Relating to the minimum wage.), As Introduced

HB183 by Alonzo (Relating to the minimum wage.), As Introduced



No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require employers to pay each employee not less than the greater of $6.15 an hour or the federal minimum wage.   The federal minimum wage was increased to $6.55 per hour effective July 24, 2008. The federal minimum wage is scheduled to increase to $7.25 per hour on July 24, 2009. Since the federal minimum wage as of September 1, 2009 will be greater than required minimum of $6.15, the bill does not have a fiscal impact

The bill would require employers to pay each employee not less than the greater of $6.15 an hour or the federal minimum wage.  

The federal minimum wage was increased to $6.55 per hour effective July 24, 2008. The federal minimum wage is scheduled to increase to $7.25 per hour on July 24, 2009. Since the federal minimum wage as of September 1, 2009 will be greater than required minimum of $6.15, the bill does not have a fiscal impact

Local Government Impact

Local workforce development boards are covered by the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 and are exempt from compliance with the provisions of the bill; therefore, no fiscal implication to local workforce development boards is anticipated. 

Local workforce development boards are covered by the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 and are exempt from compliance with the provisions of the bill; therefore, no fiscal implication to local workforce development boards is anticipated. 

Source Agencies: 303 Facilities Commission, 320 Texas Workforce Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 601 Department of Transportation

303 Facilities Commission, 320 Texas Workforce Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 601 Department of Transportation

LBB Staff: JOB, JRO, MB, TP

 JOB, JRO, MB, TP