Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB186 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R2500 CLG-D
 By: Alonzo H.B. No. 186


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Bureau for Economic Development and
 Hispanic Studies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle E, Title 4, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 470 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 470. BUREAU FOR ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND
 HISPANIC STUDIES
 Sec. 470.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "bureau" means
 the Bureau for Economic Development and Hispanic Studies.
 Sec. 470.002.  BUREAU; MEMBERS.  (a) The Bureau for Economic
 Development and Hispanic Studies is an agency of the state.
 (b)  The bureau is composed of 18 members appointed by the
 governor with the advice and consent of the senate.
 (c)  In making the appointments, the governor shall appoint
 six of the members from a list of nominees submitted by the Mexican
 American Legislative Caucus of the house of representatives and
 shall appoint six of the members from a list of nominees submitted
 by the Hispanic Caucus of the senate. The caucuses, in nominating
 members, and the governor, in appointing members, shall provide for
 representation of the diversity of this state and shall include
 members from both urban and rural areas and from all geographic
 areas of the state.  If necessary to make the appointments under
 this subsection, the governor may request and a caucus shall give to
 the governor additional lists of nominees.
 (d) A member of the bureau must:
 (1) be a resident of this state; and
 (2)  have demonstrated an interest in preserving the
 cultural heritage of the Hispanic citizens of this state and in
 advancing educational and economic opportunities and political
 rights for Hispanic citizens.
 Sec. 470.003.  TERMS.  Members serve for staggered terms of
 six years, with the terms of one-third of the members expiring
 February 1 of each odd-numbered year.
 Sec. 470.004.  MEETINGS; OFFICERS; OFFICE.  (a) The bureau
 shall hold at least one regular meeting in each calendar quarter of
 each year.
 (b)  At its first meeting in each odd-numbered year, the
 bureau shall select from its membership a presiding officer and an
 assistant presiding officer.
 (c) The bureau shall maintain its main office at Dallas.
 Sec. 470.005.  EXPENSES.  A member of the bureau is entitled
 to reimbursement for expenses incurred for service on the bureau,
 as provided by the General Appropriations Act. A member may not
 receive any compensation for that service.
 Sec. 470.006.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The bureau is subject to
 Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as
 provided by that chapter, the bureau is abolished and this chapter
 expires September 1, 2021.
 Sec. 470.007.  PERSONNEL.  (a) The bureau shall employ an
 executive director.
 (b)  The executive director may employ personnel necessary
 to implement this chapter.
 Sec. 470.008. DUTIES. The bureau shall:
 (1)  develop proposals for maximizing trade between
 this state and all foreign countries;
 (2)  undertake research to encourage the analysis of
 public policies affecting Hispanic citizens;
 (3)  conduct studies and develop policy proposals on
 issues of particular interest and importance to Hispanic citizens,
 including studies and policies relating to:
 (A) educational issues;
 (B)  employment opportunities, including means by
 which opportunities created by foreign trade agreements and federal
 funds may be used to prevent loss of jobs by Hispanic citizens;
 (C) access to social services;
 (D)  family issues, including issues regarding
 child abuse and family violence;
 (E)  political rights and access, including
 voting rights and rights relating to the use of languages;
 (F) immigration rights;
 (G) administrative law and regulatory issues;
 (H)  customs law and other law governing
 international trade;
 (I)  relevant cultural differences, including the
 effects of use of different languages;
 (J) affirmative action programs;
 (K) alcohol and drug abuse; and
 (L) other pertinent issues;
 (4)  serve as a clearinghouse of information for other
 agencies and organizations concerned with issues of importance to
 Hispanic citizens; and
 (5)  distribute the results of its studies and policy
 proposals to appropriate federal, state, and local governmental
 agencies and officials, community organizations, private leaders,
 and the public.
 Sec. 470.009.  ASSISTANCE.  The Texas Economic Development
 and Tourism Office and state institutions of higher education shall
 assist the bureau in carrying out its duties.
 Sec. 470.010.  GIFTS AND GRANTS.  The bureau may accept gifts
 and grants from any source to be used to carry out the bureau's
 duties.  The bureau shall actively seek gifts from businesses and
 organizations that represent businesses to support the bureau's
 functions.
 SECTION 2. In making the initial appointments to the Bureau
 for Economic Development and Hispanic Studies, the governor shall
 designate six members for terms expiring February 1, 2011, six
 members for terms expiring February 1, 2013, and six members for
 terms expiring February 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.