81R457 KSD-D By: Alonzo H.B. No. 188 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the rights of children and the education of parents regarding their duties as parents. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: ARTICLE 1. CHILDREN'S BILL OF RIGHTS SECTION 1.01. Chapter 151, Family Code, is amended by adding Section 151.005 to read as follows: Sec. 151.005. CHILDREN'S BILL OF RIGHTS. (a) It is the intent of the legislature to ensure that: (1) children are the number one priority of this state; and (2) parents are educated regarding their duties under law as the primary protectors of their children. (b) It is the policy of this state that each child has the right to: (1) live in a safe, healthy, and comfortable home in which the child is treated with respect; (2) be free from physical, sexual, emotional, and other abuse or neglect and any form of discipline that humiliates or demeans the child; (3) receive adequate and healthy food; (4) receive access to a quality education; and (5) receive appropriate medical, dental, vision, and mental health services. SECTION 1.02. Chapter 265, Family Code, is amended by adding Section 265.006 to read as follows: Sec. 265.006. PUBLIC AWARENESS AND OUTREACH CAMPAIGN REGARDING CHILDREN'S BILL OF RIGHTS. (a) Not later than September 1, 2010, the department shall develop and implement a statewide public awareness and outreach campaign designed to educate the public regarding the legislature's adoption and content of the children's bill of rights under Section 151.005. (b) The department may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private source for purposes of this section. (c) This section expires December 31, 2011. SECTION 1.03. Subchapter A, Chapter 192, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 192.0035 to read as follows: Sec. 192.0035. PRESENTATION TO PARENTS OF PROCLAMATION OF CHILDREN'S BILL OF RIGHTS. (a) As soon as practicable after a child's birth or adoption certificate is filed under this chapter or a child's birth is reported under this chapter, the department shall present to each of the child's parents a written proclamation of the children's bill of rights prescribed by Section 151.005, Family Code. (b) The department, in consultation with the office of the governor, shall establish the form, content, and manner of presentation of the proclamation required by this section. The proclamation must include a signed statement from the governor congratulating the parent on the child's birth and informing the parent of the parent's duties in relation to the child imposed under the Family Code and other law. (c) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt rules for the administration of this section. ARTICLE 2. FAMILY EDUCATION CENTERS SECTION 2.01. Subchapter F, Chapter 130, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 130.093 to read as follows: Sec. 130.093. FAMILY EDUCATION CENTERS. (a) The board of trustees of a junior college district may establish, in conjunction with other public or private institutions of higher education and other participating private entities, a family education center. The family education center must be administered under a formal agreement entered into by the district with the other member institutions and entities. (b) The family education center shall provide comprehensive family educational activities and training to the residents of the region in which the center is located. (c) The member institutions and entities of the family education center shall establish the curriculum for the center in consultation with the prevention and early intervention services division of the Department of Family and Protective Services. The curriculum must be designed to: (1) educate parents regarding their duties under law as the primary protectors of their children; (2) promote the prevention and amelioration of child abuse and neglect; (3) reduce the need for state and local services addressing child maltreatment; and (4) engage family members in individual and group sessions designed to: (A) prevent the occurrence of family violence; (B) address addiction problems and other mental health issues of family members; (C) equip family members with strategies to reduce stress and anxiety and creative ideas for family activities; (D) foster communication, respect, forgiveness, and intimacy among family members; (E) build self-esteem; (F) develop short- and long-term family goals; (G) develop vocational skills; (H) develop life skills, including skills relating to parenting, discipline, positive reinforcement, infant care, household budgeting, financial planning, daily planning of household chores, nutrition and wellness, personal care, and community volunteerism; and (I) address any other family educational goals of the local community served by the center. (d) The member institutions and entities of the family education center shall work with the local community to identify and offer courses that will meet the family educational goals for the region served by the center. (e) The member institutions and entities of the family education center, under the terms of the formal agreement, may make provisions for adequate physical facilities for use by the center. (f) The member institutions and entities of the family education center may solicit, accept, and administer, on terms acceptable to the members, gifts, grants, and donations of any kind and from any public or private source for use by the center. SECTION 2.02. Chapter 265, Family Code, is amended by adding Sections 265.007 and 265.008 to read as follows: Sec. 265.007. FAMILY EDUCATION CENTER CURRICULUM DEVELOPMENT. On request by the member institutions and entities of a family education center established under Section 130.093, Education Code, the department shall assist the member institutions and entities in developing a comprehensive curriculum for the center designed to meet the goals prescribed by Section 130.093(c), Education Code. Sec. 265.008. FEASIBILITY STUDY REGARDING FAMILY EDUCATION CENTERS; REPORT. (a) The department shall evaluate the feasibility of requiring certain families who are the subject of a report of alleged abuse or neglect of a child under this subtitle to participate in educational activities offered by a family education center established under Section 130.093, Education Code, as an alternative to removing the child from the child's home. (b) Not later than December 1, 2010, the department shall prepare and submit to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the members of the legislature a report containing the department's findings regarding the feasibility study conducted by the department under Subsection (a) and the department's recommendations regarding whether family education centers should be established statewide. (c) This section expires September 1, 2011. ARTICLE 3. EFFECTIVE DATE SECTION 3.01. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.