Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1881 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Miller of Erath, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 1881
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 12, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 12, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Texas Equine Incentive Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.044 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.044.  EQUINE INCENTIVE PROGRAM. (a)  The department
 shall create and administer an equine incentive program to provide
 an incentive for the owners of certain Texas-based horses to enter
 the horses as participants in horse events in this state. The
 program may apply only to the following breeds of horses:
 (1) Appaloosa horses;
 (2) paint horses; and
 (3) quarter horses.
 (b)  On the filing of an annual report with the applicable
 breeders' association, the owner of a stallion that has bred more
 than five mares during the 12-month period preceding the report
 shall submit a duplicate of the report to the department for the
 sixth and any subsequent mare bred by the stallion. An owner
 required to submit a duplicate breeding report by this subsection
 shall pay the department an equine incentive program fee in an
 amount of not less than $30 per mare bred, as determined by the
 department, in connection with each report submitted to the
 department.
 (c)  An owner required by Subsection (b) to submit a
 duplicate breeding report and equine incentive program fee may
 elect not to participate in the program by giving written notice to
 the department not later than the 30th day before the owner's annual
 breeding report is due to the applicable breeders' association.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the owner of a stallion
 that has bred fewer than six mares may elect to participate in the
 program by submitting a duplicate breeding report and paying the
 equine incentive program fee required by Subsection (b) for each
 mare bred by the stallion.
 (e)  The department by rule shall provide for the use of fees
 collected under Subsection (b) to grant equine incentive awards to
 the owners of eligible foals that participate in horse events in
 this state. A foal is eligible for an incentive award under this
 section only if an equine incentive program fee has been paid on
 behalf of the foal's dam.
 (f)  The department by rule shall establish a point system by
 which the owner of an eligible foal may receive an equine incentive
 award based on the foal's participation in horse events held in this
 state that are sanctioned by the applicable horse breeders'
 association.
 (g)  The department may use not more than five percent of the
 fees collected under Subsection (b) to administer the program.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *