Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1963 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1963
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 1, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 6, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eliminating the limitation on lottery advertising
 expenses based on the lottery prize payout percentage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 466.015(d), Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *