Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1966 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 6, 2009      TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1966 by Davis, John (Relating to an e-prescribing implementation plan under the Medicaid and child health plan programs.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill requires that an e-Prescribing Implementation Plan be developed by the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) under the auspices of the Vendor Drug Program for Medicaid and the child health plan programs.  The bill also requires that the implementation plan establish e-Prescribing standards and time frames for compliance of those standards, for pharmacists, practitioners, pharmacy benefit managers, and health plans that transmit prescriptions for Medicaid and child health plan programs.  HHSC is required to submit two reports, including estimated costs or savings related to the e-Prescribing imlementation plan, with an initial report being submitted to the Governor and the Legislative Budget Board (LBB) on December 1, 2009 and a final report submitted to the Governor and the LBB on December 1, 2010. Should e-Prescribing be implemented cost savings may be achieved in the Vendor Drug, Medicaid and child health plan programs due to a reduction in medical errors, electronic and administrative efficiencies, and a reduction in fraud and abuse.  Implementation costs for e-Prescribing may be offset if HHSC receives an allocation of federal Health Information Technology funds, which were appropriated under the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act, for the implementation of electronic health records and e-prescribing technology by states and health care providers.   This bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all memebers elected to each house, or September 1, 2009 if a two thirds vote is not achieved. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, MH, GD    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 6, 2009





  TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1966 by Davis, John (Relating to an e-prescribing implementation plan under the Medicaid and child health plan programs.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1966 by Davis, John (Relating to an e-prescribing implementation plan under the Medicaid and child health plan programs.), As Introduced

 Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health 

 Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1966 by Davis, John (Relating to an e-prescribing implementation plan under the Medicaid and child health plan programs.), As Introduced

HB1966 by Davis, John (Relating to an e-prescribing implementation plan under the Medicaid and child health plan programs.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill requires that an e-Prescribing Implementation Plan be developed by the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) under the auspices of the Vendor Drug Program for Medicaid and the child health plan programs.  The bill also requires that the implementation plan establish e-Prescribing standards and time frames for compliance of those standards, for pharmacists, practitioners, pharmacy benefit managers, and health plans that transmit prescriptions for Medicaid and child health plan programs.  HHSC is required to submit two reports, including estimated costs or savings related to the e-Prescribing imlementation plan, with an initial report being submitted to the Governor and the Legislative Budget Board (LBB) on December 1, 2009 and a final report submitted to the Governor and the LBB on December 1, 2010. Should e-Prescribing be implemented cost savings may be achieved in the Vendor Drug, Medicaid and child health plan programs due to a reduction in medical errors, electronic and administrative efficiencies, and a reduction in fraud and abuse.  Implementation costs for e-Prescribing may be offset if HHSC receives an allocation of federal Health Information Technology funds, which were appropriated under the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act, for the implementation of electronic health records and e-prescribing technology by states and health care providers.   This bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all memebers elected to each house, or September 1, 2009 if a two thirds vote is not achieved.

The bill requires that an e-Prescribing Implementation Plan be developed by the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) under the auspices of the Vendor Drug Program for Medicaid and the child health plan programs.  The bill also requires that the implementation plan establish e-Prescribing standards and time frames for compliance of those standards, for pharmacists, practitioners, pharmacy benefit managers, and health plans that transmit prescriptions for Medicaid and child health plan programs.  HHSC is required to submit two reports, including estimated costs or savings related to the e-Prescribing imlementation plan, with an initial report being submitted to the Governor and the Legislative Budget Board (LBB) on December 1, 2009 and a final report submitted to the Governor and the LBB on December 1, 2010.

Should e-Prescribing be implemented cost savings may be achieved in the Vendor Drug, Medicaid and child health plan programs due to a reduction in medical errors, electronic and administrative efficiencies, and a reduction in fraud and abuse.  Implementation costs for e-Prescribing may be offset if HHSC receives an allocation of federal Health Information Technology funds, which were appropriated under the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act, for the implementation of electronic health records and e-prescribing technology by states and health care providers.  

This bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all memebers elected to each house, or September 1, 2009 if a two thirds vote is not achieved.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission

529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, MH, GD

 JOB, CL, MH, GD