Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1978 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R5542 JSC-D
 By: Farias H.B. No. 1978


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth
 development competitive grant pilot program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 531, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter S to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER S.  EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH DEVELOPMENT COMPETITIVE GRANT
 PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 531.751.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "adolescent"
 means a person who is at least 12 years of age but younger than 18
 years of age.
 Sec. 531.752.  ESTABLISHMENT OF EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH
 DEVELOPMENT COMPETITIVE GRANT PILOT PROGRAM.  (a)  The commission
 shall establish an evidence-based youth development competitive
 grant pilot program to award grants for the implementation,
 expansion, and operation of evidence-based youth development
 programs designed to provide information and guidance for not more
 than 75 adolescents in making healthy and beneficial life choices.
 (b)  The pilot program shall be located in Bexar County and
 serve regions that are:
 (1)  located in zip codes in which the school-age birth
 rate is at least three times the national school-age birth rate; and
 (2) served by one or more school districts in which:
 (A)  at least 90 percent of the student population
 is economically disadvantaged; and
 (B)  the annual dropout rate for grades 7 through
 12 is greater than five percent.
 Sec. 531.753.  EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH DEVELOPMENT PROGRAM
 REQUIREMENTS. (a)  An evidence-based youth development program
 funded through a grant awarded under this subchapter must:
 (1) target adolescents who:
 (A)  are at risk of becoming pregnant or causing
 an unplanned pregnancy or already have a child;
 (B)  are at risk of engaging in delinquent conduct
 or conduct indicating a need for supervision, as those terms are
 defined by Section 51.03, Family Code;
 (C) are at risk of dropping out of school;
 (D)  live in foster care or in a facility operated
 by the state; or
 (E)  live in economically disadvantaged
 circumstances;
 (2)  feature a curriculum that is appropriate for
 adolescents and that has been demonstrated to reduce school dropout
 and adolescent pregnancy rates;
 (3)  include a community service component of not fewer
 than 20 hours each year;
 (4)  include at least one activity session or group
 discussion each week; and
 (5)  cover a wide variety of developmental topics of
 interest to adolescents, including:
 (A) development of values and good judgment;
 (B) communication and assertiveness;
 (C) healthy relationships;
 (D) influence of others and peer pressure;
 (E) goal-setting;
 (F) decision-making;
 (G) development and human sexuality;
 (H)  preparation for participation in community
 service activities;
 (I) community service learning; and
 (J)  group reflection on community service
 experiences.
 (b)  An evidence-based youth development program must
 operate for not less than nine months or an academic school year.
 Sec. 531.754.  APPLICATION. (a)  A public or private entity,
 including a county, municipality, or other political subdivision of
 this state, may apply for a grant under this subchapter by
 submitting a written application to the commission on a form
 prescribed by the commission.
 (b) The application prescribed by the commission must:
 (1)  require the applicant to provide data on the
 number of adolescents who will receive assistance through the
 program;
 (2)  describe the ongoing monitoring and evaluation
 process to which a grant recipient is subject, including the
 recipient's obligation to collect and provide information
 requested by the commission; and
 (3)  require the applicant to provide other relevant
 information as determined by the commission.
 Sec. 531.755.  ADDITIONAL CONSIDERATIONS IN AWARDING
 GRANTS. In determining whether to award a grant under this
 subchapter, the commission shall consider:
 (1)  the demonstrated need for an evidence-based youth
 development program in the community in which the applicant
 proposes to operate or expand the program, as determined by:
 (A) the poverty rate;
 (B) the crime rate;
 (C) the school-age birth rate;
 (D) the rate of drug and alcohol abuse; and
 (E)  the annual dropout rate for grades 7 through
 12;
 (2)  the applicant's ability to participate in ongoing
 monitoring and performance evaluations, including the applicant's
 ability to collect and provide information required by the
 commission;
 (3)  the applicant's ability to adhere to the
 evidence-based youth development program operating and performance
 standards;
 (4)  the applicant's ability to develop broad-based
 community support for implementing or expanding an evidence-based
 youth development program, as applicable; and
 (5)  the applicant's history of developing and
 sustaining innovative, high-quality programs that meet the needs of
 families and communities.
 Sec. 531.756.  EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH DEVELOPMENT PROGRAM
 STANDARDS. The executive commissioner, in accordance with the
 goals and requirements established by this subchapter, shall adopt
 standards for an evidence-based youth development program awarded a
 grant under this subchapter.
 Sec. 531.757.  USE OF AWARDED GRANT FUNDS. The grant funds
 awarded under this subchapter may be used only to cover costs
 related to implementing, expanding, or operating an evidence-based
 youth development program, including costs related to:
 (1) administering the program, including:
 (A) appropriate local site selection; and
 (B) required evaluation and quality monitoring;
 (2) training and managing staff;
 (3) paying staff salaries and expenses; and
 (4) paying for program facilities and equipment.
 Sec. 531.758.  EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH DEVELOPMENT PROGRAM
 MONITORING AND EVALUATION; COMMITTEE REPORT. (a)  The executive
 commissioner shall adopt performance indicators designed to
 measure a grant recipient's performance with respect to the
 evidence-based youth development program standards adopted by the
 executive commissioner under Section 531.756.
 (b)  The commission shall use the performance indicators to
 monitor and evaluate the performance of each grant recipient.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2010, the commission shall
 submit a report to the Senate Health and Human Services Committee,
 or its successor, and the House Human Services Committee, or its
 successor, regarding the performance of each grant recipient with
 respect to providing evidence-based youth development program
 services, including:
 (1)  the number of low-income adolescents served by an
 evidence-based youth development program and, of that number, the
 number of adolescents who subsequently became pregnant or caused a
 pregnancy; and
 (2) any other information required by the commission.
 (d)  On request, each grant recipient shall timely collect
 and provide data and any other information required by the
 commission to monitor and evaluate the recipient or to prepare the
 report required by this section.
 Sec. 531.759.  EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH DEVELOPMENT COMPETITIVE
 GRANT PILOT PROGRAM FUNDING. (a)  The commission shall actively
 seek and apply for any available federal funds or grants from any
 source to assist in financing the competitive grant pilot program
 established under this subchapter.
 (b)  The commission may use appropriated funds and may accept
 gifts, donations, and grants of money from the federal government,
 local governments, private corporations, or other persons to assist
 in financing the competitive grant pilot program.
 Sec. 531.760.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall, as soon as practicable after the effective date of this Act,
 apply for any available funds or grants to assist in financing the
 evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program
 created by this Act.
 (b) Not later than December 1, 2009, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall establish and implement the
 evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program
 created by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.