Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1978 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 10, 2009      TO: Honorable Patrick M. Rose, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1978 by Farias (Relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1978, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($256,525) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 10, 2009





  TO: Honorable Patrick M. Rose, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1978 by Farias (Relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Patrick M. Rose, Chair, House Committee on Human Services
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1978 by Farias (Relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Patrick M. Rose, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 Honorable Patrick M. Rose, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1978 by Farias (Relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB1978 by Farias (Relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1978, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($256,525) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1978, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($256,525) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($163,546)   2011 ($92,979)   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0    


2010 ($163,546)
2011 ($92,979)
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($163,546)   2011 ($92,979)   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($163,546)   2011 ($92,979)   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0  


2010 ($163,546)
2011 ($92,979)
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to create an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program. The grant program must provide services to no more than 75 adolescents to assist them in making healthy and beneficial life choices. The grant program must be in Bexar County located in zip codes in which the school-age birth rate is at least three times the national average, at least 90 percent of the student population is economically disadvantaged, and the dropout rate of grades 7 to 12 is greater than 5 percent.  The grant must target adolescents who are: at risk for becoming pregnant or causing an unplanned pregnancy or who already have a child; at risk for engaging or are engaging in delinquent behavior; at risk of dropping out of school; living in foster care or in a facility operated by the state; or living in economically disadvantaged circumstances. The program must operate for not less than nine months.  The grant funds may only be used for administering the program, including site selection and required evaluation and quality monitoring; training and managing staff; paying staff salaries and expenses; and paying for program facilities and expenses.  No later than November 1, 2011 DFPS must submit a report to the legislature regarding the performance of each grant recipient with respect to providing evidence-based youth development program services, including the number of low-income adolescents served, and the number of adolescents who became pregnant or caused a pregnancy.  The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.  The program must be implemented during a nine month period beginning not earlier than August 1, 2010 and not later than September 30, 2010.  This act would expire December 31, 2011.

Methodology

DFPS estimates that $163,546 in General Revenue Funds would be needed in fiscal year 2010 and $92,979 in General Revenue Funds would be needed in fiscal year 2011.  The agency modeled the costs on an existing program which meets the criteria of the bill.  If the agency recieved Federal Funds or grants for this program, the cost to General Revenue would be reduced.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, BM, MB

 JOB, CL, BM, MB