Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2003 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: McCall, Castro, Orr (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2003
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2009;
 May 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the offense of online harassment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 33, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 33.07 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.07.  ONLINE HARASSMENT. (a) A person commits an
 offense if the person uses the name or persona of another person to
 create a web page on or to post one or more messages on a commercial
 social networking site:
 (1) without obtaining the other person's consent; and
 (2)  with the intent to harm, defraud, intimidate, or
 threaten any person.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person sends an
 electronic mail, instant message, text message, or similar
 communication that references a name, domain address, phone number,
 or other item of identifying information belonging to any person:
 (1) without obtaining the other person's consent;
 (2)  with the intent to cause a recipient of the
 communication to reasonably believe that the other person
 authorized or transmitted the communication; and
 (3) with the intent to harm or defraud any person.
 (c)  An offense under Subsection (a) is a felony of the third
 degree. An offense under Subsection (b) is a Class A misdemeanor,
 except that the offense is a felony of the third degree if the actor
 commits the offense with the intent to solicit a response by
 emergency personnel.
 (d)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor
 may be prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 (e)  It is a defense to prosecution under this section that
 the actor's conduct consisted solely of action taken as an employee
 of:
 (1) a commercial social networking site;
 (2) an Internet service provider;
 (3)  an interactive computer service, as defined by 47
 U.S.C. Section 230;
 (4)  a telecommunications provider, as defined by
 Section 51.002, Utilities Code; or
 (5)  a video service provider or cable service
 provider, as defined by Section 66.002, Utilities Code.
 (f) In this section:
 (1)  "Commercial social networking site" means any
 business, organization, or other similar entity operating a website
 that permits persons to become registered users for the purpose of
 establishing personal relationships with other users through
 direct or real-time communication with other users or the creation
 of web pages or profiles available to the public or to other users.
 The term does not include an electronic mail program or a message
 board program.
 (2)  "Identifying information" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 32.51.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *