BILL ANALYSIS H.B. 2021 By: Weber Transportation Committee Report (Unamended) BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE The Matagorda County Navigation District No. 1 has experienced a significant increase in the size and type of operations since its creation. The board of commissioners of the district held two public meetings and received unanimous support to increase the number of commissioners serving on the board. Notice of intent to file legislation was published on January 25, 2009, and a resolution of support was adopted by the current board of commissioners on February 19, 2009. H.B. 2021 establishes a five-member board of navigation and canal commissioners to govern the Matagorda County Navigation District No. 1 and provides for three commissioners to be elected in November 2010. RULEMAKING AUTHORITY It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution. ANALYSIS H.B. 2021 amends the Special District Local Laws Code to establish the board of navigation and canal commissioners of the Matagorda County Navigation District No. 1. The bill provides that the board consists of five commissioners elected at large to serve staggered six year terms, with the terms of one or two commissioners expiring on November 30 of each even-numbered year. The bill requires an election to be held in the district every two years on the uniform election date in November to elect one or two commissioners. The bill requires the board to hold an election on the uniform election date in November 2010 to elect one commissioner to serve a term expiring November 30, 2014, and two commissioners to serve terms expiring November 30, 2016, and requires the board to hold an election on the uniform election date in November of each even-numbered year after 2010. The bill defines "board," "commissioner," and "district" for the purposes of these provisions. EFFECTIVE DATE On passage, or, if the act does not receive the necessary vote, the act takes effect September 1, 2009. BILL ANALYSIS # BILL ANALYSIS H.B. 2021 By: Weber Transportation Committee Report (Unamended) H.B. 2021 By: Weber Transportation Committee Report (Unamended) BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE The Matagorda County Navigation District No. 1 has experienced a significant increase in the size and type of operations since its creation. The board of commissioners of the district held two public meetings and received unanimous support to increase the number of commissioners serving on the board. Notice of intent to file legislation was published on January 25, 2009, and a resolution of support was adopted by the current board of commissioners on February 19, 2009. H.B. 2021 establishes a five-member board of navigation and canal commissioners to govern the Matagorda County Navigation District No. 1 and provides for three commissioners to be elected in November 2010. RULEMAKING AUTHORITY It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution. ANALYSIS H.B. 2021 amends the Special District Local Laws Code to establish the board of navigation and canal commissioners of the Matagorda County Navigation District No. 1. The bill provides that the board consists of five commissioners elected at large to serve staggered six year terms, with the terms of one or two commissioners expiring on November 30 of each even-numbered year. The bill requires an election to be held in the district every two years on the uniform election date in November to elect one or two commissioners. The bill requires the board to hold an election on the uniform election date in November 2010 to elect one commissioner to serve a term expiring November 30, 2014, and two commissioners to serve terms expiring November 30, 2016, and requires the board to hold an election on the uniform election date in November of each even-numbered year after 2010. The bill defines "board," "commissioner," and "district" for the purposes of these provisions. EFFECTIVE DATE On passage, or, if the act does not receive the necessary vote, the act takes effect September 1, 2009. BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE The Matagorda County Navigation District No. 1 has experienced a significant increase in the size and type of operations since its creation. The board of commissioners of the district held two public meetings and received unanimous support to increase the number of commissioners serving on the board. Notice of intent to file legislation was published on January 25, 2009, and a resolution of support was adopted by the current board of commissioners on February 19, 2009. H.B. 2021 establishes a five-member board of navigation and canal commissioners to govern the Matagorda County Navigation District No. 1 and provides for three commissioners to be elected in November 2010. RULEMAKING AUTHORITY It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution. ANALYSIS H.B. 2021 amends the Special District Local Laws Code to establish the board of navigation and canal commissioners of the Matagorda County Navigation District No. 1. The bill provides that the board consists of five commissioners elected at large to serve staggered six year terms, with the terms of one or two commissioners expiring on November 30 of each even-numbered year. The bill requires an election to be held in the district every two years on the uniform election date in November to elect one or two commissioners. The bill requires the board to hold an election on the uniform election date in November 2010 to elect one commissioner to serve a term expiring November 30, 2014, and two commissioners to serve terms expiring November 30, 2016, and requires the board to hold an election on the uniform election date in November of each even-numbered year after 2010. The bill defines "board," "commissioner," and "district" for the purposes of these provisions. EFFECTIVE DATE On passage, or, if the act does not receive the necessary vote, the act takes effect September 1, 2009.