Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2030 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zerwas (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 2030
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2009;
 April 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 8, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 8, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Medicaid Drug Utilization Review Program and
 prescription drug use under the Medicaid program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 531.0691, 531.0692, and 531.0693 to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 531.0691.  MEDICAID DRUG UTILIZATION REVIEW PROGRAM:
 DRUG USE REVIEWS AND ANNUAL REPORT. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Medicaid Drug Utilization Review Program" means
 the program operated by the vendor drug program to improve the
 quality of pharmaceutical care under the Medicaid program.
 (2)  "Prospective drug use review" means the review of
 a patient's drug therapy and prescription drug order or medication
 order before dispensing or distributing a drug to the patient.
 (3)  "Retrospective drug use review" means the review
 of prescription drug claims data to identify patterns of
 prescribing.
 (b)  The commission shall provide for an increase in the
 number and types of retrospective drug use reviews performed each
 year under the Medicaid Drug Utilization Review Program, in
 comparison to the number and types of reviews performed in the state
 fiscal year ending August 31, 2009.
 (c)  In determining the number and types of drug use reviews
 to be performed, the commission shall:
 (1)  allow for the repeat of retrospective drug use
 reviews that address ongoing drug therapy problems and that, in
 previous years, improved client outcomes and reduced Medicaid
 spending;
 (2)  consider implementing disease-specific
 retrospective drug use reviews that address ongoing drug therapy
 problems in this state and that reduced Medicaid prescription drug
 use expenditures in other states; and
 (3)  regularly examine Medicaid prescription drug
 claims data to identify occurrences of potential drug therapy
 problems that may be addressed by repeating successful
 retrospective drug use reviews performed in this state and other
 states.
 (d)  In addition to any other information required by federal
 law, the commission shall include the following information in the
 annual report regarding the Medicaid Drug Utilization Review
 Program:
 (1)  a detailed description of the program's
 activities; and
 (2)  estimates of cost savings anticipated to result
 from the program's performance of prospective and retrospective
 drug use reviews.
 (e)  The cost-saving estimates for prospective drug use
 reviews under Subsection (d) must include savings attributed to
 drug use reviews performed through the vendor drug program's
 electronic claims processing system and clinical edits screened
 through the prior authorization system implemented under Section
 531.073.
 (f)  The commission shall post the annual report regarding
 the Medicaid Drug Utilization Review Program on the commission's
 website.
 Sec. 531.0692.  MEDICAID DRUG UTILIZATION REVIEW BOARD:
 CONFLICTS OF INTEREST.  (a) A member of the board of the Medicaid
 Drug Utilization Review Program may not have a contractual
 relationship, ownership interest, or other conflict of interest
 with a pharmaceutical manufacturer or labeler or with an entity
 engaged by the commission to assist in the administration of the
 Medicaid Drug Utilization Review Program.
 (b)  The executive commissioner may implement this section
 by adopting rules that identify prohibited relationships and
 conflicts or requiring the board to develop a conflict-of-interest
 policy that applies to the board.
 Sec. 531.0693.  PRESCRIPTION DRUG USE AND EXPENDITURE
 PATTERNS. (a) The commission shall monitor and analyze
 prescription drug use and expenditure patterns in the Medicaid
 program.  The commission shall identify the therapeutic
 prescription drug classes and individual prescription drugs that
 are most often prescribed to patients or that represent the
 greatest expenditures.
 (b)  The commission shall post the data determined by the
 commission under Subsection (a) on the commission's website and
 update the information on a quarterly basis.
 SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *