Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2031 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: England (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2031
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of sight order for purposes of
 prosecuting certain criminal offenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1.07(a), Penal Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (46-a) to read as follows:
 (46-a)  "Sight order" means a written or electronic
 instruction to pay money that is authorized by the person giving the
 instruction and that is payable on demand or at a definite time by
 the person being instructed to pay. The term includes a check, an
 electronic debit, or an automatic bank draft.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *