Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB205 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Aycock (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 205
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 7, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 7, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of certain city requirements
 affecting the restraint of certain dogs on annexed or otherwise
 acquired property used for agricultural operations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 251.005, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-2) to read as follows:
 (c-2)  A governmental requirement of a city relating to the
 restraint of a dog that would apply to an agricultural operation
 under Subsection (c) does not apply to a dog used to protect
 livestock on property controlled by the property owner while the
 dog is being used on such property for that purpose.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *