Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2064 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R17260 TJS-F
 By: Smithee, Hardcastle, Eiland, Bohac, H.B. No. 2064
 Alonzo, et al.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to premium discounts for certain participants in the Texas
 Health Insurance Risk Pool and to related tax credits for health
 benefit plan issuers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1506.105, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsections (e-1) and (e-2) to
 read as follows:
 (e) Premium rates shall be established to provide fully for
 all of the expected costs of claims, including recovery of prior
 losses, expenses of operation, investment income from claim
 reserves, and any other cost factors, subject to the limitations
 [limitation] described in this subsection and Subsection (e-1). In
 no event may pool premium rates exceed 200 percent of the standard
 risk rate described by Subsection (d) [rates applicable to
 individual standard risks].
 (e-1)  Subject to Subsection (e-2), discounted premiums
 shall be offered on a sliding scale, based on financial need, as
 follows:
 (1)  for an individual whose household income is below
 200 percent of the federal poverty measure, determined under the
 United States Department of Health and Human Services poverty
 guidelines in effect at the time coverage is provided, premium
 rates shall equal the standard risk rate described by Subsection
 (d); and
 (2)  for an individual whose household income is at or
 below 300 percent, but not less than 200 percent, of the federal
 poverty measure, determined under the United States Department of
 Health and Human Services poverty guidelines in effect at the time
 coverage is provided, premium rates shall equal 140 percent of the
 standard risk rate described by Subsection (d).
 (e-2)  The aggregate premium discount under Subsection
 (e-1), determined by subtracting the dollar amount of premiums
 collected under Subsection (e-1) from the dollar amount that would
 have been collected if a discount was not available under
 Subsection (e-1), may not exceed $20 million in any two-year
 period, beginning with the two-year period that begins January 1,
 2010, and ends December 31, 2011.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 1506, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1506.260 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1506.260.  TAX CREDIT.  (a)  A health benefit plan
 issuer is entitled to a credit against the issuer's premium tax
 under Chapter 222 for premium discounts granted under Section
 1506.105(e-1).  Each issuer's share of the premium discounts is
 based on the method described by Section 1506.253 as calculated by
 the pool.
 (b)  The tax credit applies to the premium tax due in the
 calendar year following the calendar year in which the assessment
 is paid. An unused credit may be carried over to apply to the
 premium tax due in the five consecutive calendar years that follow
 the calendar year in which the credit may first be applied.
 (c)  The balance of a tax credit not claimed in a particular
 calendar year may be reflected in the books and records of the
 issuer as an admitted asset of the issuer.
 (d)  Available credit against premium tax allowed under this
 section may be transferred or assigned among health benefit plan
 issuers if:
 (1)  a merger, acquisition, or total assumption of
 reinsurance among the issuers occurs; or
 (2)  the commissioner by order approves the transfer or
 assignment.
 SECTION 3. (a) This Act applies only to premium rates for
 coverage through the Texas Health Insurance Risk Pool under Chapter
 1506, Insurance Code, as amended by this Act, that is in effect on
 or after January 1, 2010. Premium rates for coverage in effect
 before January 1, 2010, are governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b) A health benefit plan issuer may apply a tax credit
 under Section 1506.260, Insurance Code, as added by this Act,
 beginning with the first premium tax payment that is due on or after
 January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.